EP1068660 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR MODULATING TERMINAL VOLTAGE OF BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC. 25225 Detroit Road, P O Box 450777 Westlake Ohio 44145-0616 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Eveready Battery Company, Inc. 25225 Detroit Road, P O Box 450777 Westlake, Ohio 44145-0616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Syed, M. 3120 N.W. John Olsen Avenue 20-301 Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Lord, Hilton David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Lord, Hilton David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912944.8 | 30.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999US06906 | Priority number, date | US19980050310 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: US 50310 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950947 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068660 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068660 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
H02J7/0063 (EP,US);
H02J7/00712 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ANPASSEN DER BATTERIEKLEMMENSPANNUNG | [2003/12] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR MODULATING TERMINAL VOLTAGE OF BATTERY | [2001/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MODULER LA TENSION AUX BORNES D'UN ACCUMULATEUR | [2001/03] |
Former [2001/03] | EINRICHTUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM MODELIEREN VON BATTERIEKLEMMENSPANNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2003 | CH | 23.07.2003 | CY | 23.07.2003 | ES | 23.07.2003 | FI | 23.07.2003 | FR | 23.07.2003 | IT | 23.07.2003 | LI | 23.07.2003 | NL | 23.07.2003 | DK | 23.10.2003 | GR | 23.10.2003 | SE | 23.10.2003 | PT | 23.12.2003 | IE | 30.03.2004 | LU | 30.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
FR | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
IE | 30.03.2004 | ||
LU | 30.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
FR | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
IE | 30.03.2004 | ||
LU | 30.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
IE | 30.03.2004 | ||
LU | 30.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
IE | 30.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05207678 ; | [A]US5204608 (KOENCK STEVEN E [US]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]EP0644642 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0760547 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US5646501 (FISHMAN DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931130), vol. 017, no. 646, Database accession no. (E - 1467), & JP05207678 A 19930813 (SANSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * abstract * |