EP1066240 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ACRYLIC ACID AND ACRYLIC ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NESTLER, Gerhard Mundenheim Strasse 170 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
SCHRÖDER, Jürgen Niedererdstrasse 20 D-67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
BOLZ, Gerhard Auf der Höhe 10 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99913295.4 | 24.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999EP01998 | Priority number, date | DE19981014375 | 31.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19814375 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950220 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066240 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066240 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/21, C07C51/44, C07C57/05, C07C67/08, C07C69/54 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
C07C51/44 (EP,US);
C07C51/252 (EP,US);
C07C67/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/252, C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C51/44, C07C57/04 (US,EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/54 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [2001/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ACRYLSÄURE UND ACRYLSÄUREESTERN | [2001/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ACRYLIC ACID AND ACRYLIC ACID ESTERS | [2001/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDE ACRYLIQUE ET D'ESTERS D'ACIDE ACRYLIQUE | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1910795 (DEGUSSA) [X] 11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3555082 (SENNEWALD KURT, et al) [A] 1,11* column W *; | [DX]DE2136396 (BASF AG) [DX] 11 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Seite 6, letzter Abschnitt, erster Satz *; | [DA]EP0398226 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DPX]DE19740253 (BASF AG [DE]) [DPX] 1-11 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Spalte 3, Zeilen 50-65 * |