EP0991936 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ORIENTATION OF FIBRE STRUCTURE IN A MINERAL WOOL MAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAZIN, Sébastien 28, route de Louviers F-27400 Amfreville sur Iton / FR | 02 /
LEBRUN, Denis 21, rue de la Métairie, La Mare Hermier 27400 Amfreville sur Iton / FR | 03 /
DUPOUY, Valérie 6, allée des Acacias F-60250 La Chapelle en Serval / FR | 04 /
LEONARD, Christian 7, impasse Arcène Tallon, Boulincourt 60600 Agnetz / FR | 05 /
CHINA, François 43, Rue du Connétable 60500 Chantilly / FR | [2000/17] |
Former [2000/15] | 01 /
CAZIN, Sébastien 28, route de Louviers F-27400 Amfreville sur Iton / FR | ||
02 /
LEBRUN, Denis 21, rue de la Métairie, La Mare Hermier 27400 Amfreville sur Iton / FR | |||
03 /
DUPOUY, Valérie 6, allée des Acacias F-60250 La Chapelle en Serval / FR | |||
04 /
LEONARD, Christian 7, impasse Arcène Tallon, Boulincourt 60600 Agnetz / FR | |||
05 /
CHINA, François Bâtiment A, 10, avenue de Montmorency 60500 Chantilly / FR | Representative(s) | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE, 39, quai Lucien Lefranc-BP 135 93303 Aubervilliers Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99913415.8 | 15.04.1999 | [2000/15] | WO1999FR00882 | Priority number, date | FR19980005077 | 23.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9805077 | [2000/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9956112 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991936 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/89, G06T7/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
G01N21/8915 (EP);
G01N21/89 (KR);
G06T7/70 (EP);
G06T2207/30124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Extension states | SI | 06.12.1999 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ORIENTIERUNG DER FASERSTRUKTUR EINER MINERALWOLLMATTE | [2000/15] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ORIENTATION OF FIBRE STRUCTURE IN A MINERAL WOOL MAT | [2000/15] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA DETERMINATION DE L'ORIENTATION DE LA STRUCTURE DES FIBRES DE MATELAS DE LAINE MINERALE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 27.05.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09114980 ; | [A]US4730931 (WATSON ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 18 - line 31 * * column 2, line 49 - line L *; | [Y]EP0676047 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1,6,7 * page 7, line 20 - line 36 * * figure 5 *; | [YA]WO9619615 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,6,7 * abstract * * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 1 * * page 3, line 30 - line 32 * * page 4, line 17 - line 22 * * page 4, line 30 - line 33 * * figure 1 * [A] 10; | [A]US5640244 (HELLSTROM AKE ARVID [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 097, no. 009, & JP09114980 A 19970502 (YAMAGUCHI PREF GOV;TOKIWA SHOKAI:KK; SANSHIN CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 2,8 * abstract * |