EP1070240 - SPECIMEN SLICER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webb Microtome Limited 190 Clarence Gate Gardens London NW1 6AD / GB | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBB, Sim Fong Brisimany Walnut Hill Surlingham Norwich Norfolk NR14 7DQ / GB | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 99913503.1 | 01.04.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999GB01013 | Priority number, date | GB19980007192 | 04.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9807192 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951962 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070240 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070240 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/06 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
G01N1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, IE, IT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | PROBENSCHNEIDER | [2001/04] | English: | SPECIMEN SLICER | [2001/04] | French: | APPAREIL A DECOUPER UN PRELEVEMENT | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.07.2002 | IT | 10.07.2002 | DK | 10.10.2002 | SE | 10.10.2002 | DE | 11.10.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | IE | 01.04.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 10.07.2002 | |
DK | 10.10.2002 | ||
SE | 10.10.2002 | ||
DE | 11.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
IE | 01.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | DK | 10.10.2002 | |
SE | 10.10.2002 | ||
DE | 11.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
IE | 01.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | DK | 10.10.2002 | |
SE | 10.10.2002 | ||
DE | 11.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | DK | 10.10.2002 | |
SE | 10.10.2002 | ||
DE | 11.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 10.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2680992 (M HERBAIN) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 26 - line 54 * * column 4, line 10 - line 20; figure - * [A] 4-8,10,13; | [XA]FR558817 (L P E GÉNAT) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 24; figure - * [A] 4-7,13,14; | [A]EP0483567 (KURZ HEINZ) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 27 - line 33; figure - *; | [A]US4754675 (SEGAL JOSEPH) |