EP1076460 - IMAGE INFORMATION HIGH-SPEED COMPRESSING METHOD AND REAL-TIME MOVING PICTURE TRANSFERRING METHOD USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyushu Electronics Systems, Inc. 3-3, Kongo 2-chome, Yahatanisha-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 807-1263 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Kyushu Electronics Systems, Inc. 3-3, Kongo 2-chome, Yahatanisha-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 807-1263 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUO, Katsunori, Kyushu Electronics Syst. Inc. 3-3, Kongo 2-chome, Yahatanishi-ku Kongo 2-chome, Fukuoka 807-1263 / JP | 02 /
KAMATA, Seiichiro 3884-9, Tonno Nogata-shi, Fukuoka 822-0002 / JP | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99913644.3 | 12.04.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999JP01953 | Priority number, date | JP19990053393 | 01.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5339399 | [2001/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052936 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076460 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/26 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/649 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (KR);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/62 (EP,US);
H04N19/94 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/07] | H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSKOMPRESSION VON BILDINFORMATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTZEITÜBERTRAGUNG VON BEWEGTBILDERN UNTER DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2001/07] | English: | IMAGE INFORMATION HIGH-SPEED COMPRESSING METHOD AND REAL-TIME MOVING PICTURE TRANSFERRING METHOD USING THE SAME | [2001/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMPRESSION HAUTE VITESSE DE DONNEES D'IMAGES ET PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT D'IMAGES ANIMEES EN TEMPS REEL GRACE A CETTE TECHNIQUE | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2000 | Translation filed | 27.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5784491 (KOGA YUZURU [JP]) [A] 6,10 * figure 3A; claim 1 * * columns 1-13 *; | [A]JPH0955926 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 14-17 * abstract * * claims 1-6 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] *; | [A]JPH1093924 (SHINEKKUS INF TECHNOL INC) [A] 15-17 * claims 1-17 *; | [X] - BANDOU Y ET AL, "3-DIMENSIONAL PSEUDO-HILBERT SCANNING AND APPLICATION FOR IMAGE COMPRESSION", DENSHI JOHO TSUSHIN GAKKAI GIJUTSU KUNKYU HOKOKU - IEICETECHNICAL REPORT, DENSHI JOHO TSUSHIN GAKKAI, TOKYO, JP, (19980701), vol. 98, no. 204, ISSN 0913-5685, pages 31 - 38, XP002932917 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 8 * * page 32, paragraph 2.1 - page 36, paragraph 3.3 * * page 38, paragraph APPENDIX * | [A] - KAMATA S ET AL, "An address generator of a pseudo-Hilbert scan in a rectangle region", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA 26-29 OCT. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971026), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-8186-8183-7, pages 707 - 710, XP010254269 [A] 3 * page 708, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1997.648017 | [A] - BANDOH Y ET AL, "A METHOD OF COMPUTING A PSEUDO-HILBERT SCAN FILLING IN A CUBOID REGION", DENSHI JOUHOU TSUUSHIN GAKKAI TSUUSHIN, XX, XX, (19980101), vol. J81-D-II, no. 10, pages 2483 - 2486, XP002932918 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH07231444 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH0955926 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH1093924 (SHINEKKUS INF TECHNOL INC); | [A]JPH07288474 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH08275153 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH07288510 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH10108160 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JPH09181922 (IMEC VZW [BE], et al) | [Y] - YUKIHIRO BANDOU ET AL., "3 jigen giji hilbert sousahou to dougazou asshuku he no ouyou,(3-Dimensional Pseudo-Hilbert Scanning and Application for Image Compresion)", DENSHI JOUHOU TSUUSHIN GAKKAI GIJUTSU KENKYUU HOUKOKU IE98-30 TO 49,, (199807), vol. 98, no. 204, pages 31 - 38, XP002932917 | [Y] - YUKIHIRO BANDOU ET AL., "Chokuhoutal ryouiki o juuten suru giji hilbert sousahou, (A Method of Computing a Pseudo-Hilbert Scan Filling in a Cubiod Region)", DENSHI JOUHOU TSUUSHIN GAKKAI ROMBUNSHI D-II,, (199810), vol. J81-D-II, no. 10, pages 2483 - 2486, XP002932918 |