EP1067845 - EDIBLE SPRAY EMULSION, PACKED IN A PRESSURIZED CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMPINA MELKUNIE B.V. Hogeweg 9 NL-5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL | [2001/23] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Menken Dairy Food B.V. 20, Steenstraat 4751 GS Oud Gastel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIJER, Margarethe, Jennie Kreitenborg 16 NL-4761 SV Zevenbergen / NL | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 99913741.7 | 31.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999NL00194 | Priority number, date | NL19981008829 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: NL 1008829 | [2001/03] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951112 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067845 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067845 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/19 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
A23L9/22 (EP);
A23P30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, PT [2001/03] | Title | German: | ESSBARE SPRÜHEMULSION | [2001/03] | English: | EDIBLE SPRAY EMULSION, PACKED IN A PRESSURIZED CONTAINER | [2001/03] | French: | EMULSION COMESTIBLE A PULVERISER, EMBALLEE DANS UN RECIPIENT SOUS PRESSION | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1999 | Translation filed | 31.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 31.10.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.2003
26.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Adrianus Willem V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.2003
26.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Adrianus Willem Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | 30.09.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.02.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS61280232 ; | [A]HUT58481 ; | [A]FR2185018 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * example 8 *; | [X]US3944680 (VAN PELT JOHANNES GEORGE, et al) [X] 1-8,10 * column 5, line 29 - line 39; examples 1,8 *; | [A]EP0095001 (BRATLAND ARTHUR) [A] 1-4,6,9 * example 5 *; | [A]EP0113536 (GEN FOODS CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4-8 * example 1 *; | [A]EP0294119 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-6,9 * example .; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US4943443 (EVERS PAULUS H J M [NL]) [X] 1-6,10 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 59; example . *; | [A]EP0455288 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7,9 * examples I-III *; | [Y]EP0469656 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * examples III,IV *; | [A]EP0563593 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7,10 * example 3 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870508), vol. 011, no. 141, Database accession no. (C - 421), & JP61280232 A 19861210 (AJINOMOTO GENERAL FOOD KK) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - TOSHIAKI SHIOYA, "Influence of time thickening on the whippability of creams", JOURNAL OF TEXTURE STUDIES, (1981), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 185 - 200, XP002087752 [A] 1-4,6 * table 1 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 17, Database accession no. 92-134531, XP002087754 & HUT58481 A 19920330 (MESZAROS S) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - R. VANRUSSELT, "Crème en bombe aérosol", LAIT ET NOUS, (1992), no. 1, pages 13 - 15, XP002087753 [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |