EP1057090 - ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREITAG, Thomas Kolpingstrasse 17 D-31191 Algermissen / DE | 02 /
ZIMMERMANN, Holger Beethovenstrasse 11 D-31141 Hildesheim / DE | 03 /
BAAS, Dieter Sofienstrasse 10 D-77694 Auenheim / DE | [2000/49] | Application number, filing date | 99914429.8 | 24.02.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999DE00493 | Priority number, date | DE1998108606 | 28.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19808606 | [2000/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944110 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057090 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057090 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/46, H02M3/10 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
G11B7/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/0946 (EP,US);
G11B17/0401 (EP,US);
G11B7/0037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2000/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT | [2000/49] | English: | ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE | [2000/49] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 08.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH08273291 ; | [XA]US4598255 (HONG MIN-TAI [TW]) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 16 * [A] 2-9; | [ADP]DE19642343 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [ADP] 1-9* the whole document *; | US5834913 [ ] (YOSHIDA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,2 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, & JP08273291 A 19961018 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7 * abstract * [A] 4,6,8,9 |