EP0990106 - AIR CONDITIONING CONDENSER COMPRISING A RESERVOIR MOUNTED ON A BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR S.A. 8, rue Louis-Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | [2000/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLE, Gérard 97, rue M. Robespierre F-91550 Paray Vieille Poste / FR | 02 /
HU, Zaiqian 1, place Pierre Bérégovoy F-78280 Guyancourt / FR | [2000/14] | Application number, filing date | 99914619.4 | 20.04.1999 | [2000/14] | WO1999FR00924 | Priority number, date | FR19980004922 | 20.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9804922 | [2000/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954672 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990106 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990106 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F25B39/04, B60H1/32 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
F25B43/003 (EP,US);
B60H1/3227 (EP);
B60H1/3229 (US);
F25B39/04 (EP,US);
F25B40/02 (EP,US);
F25B2339/0441 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/14] | Title | German: | KONDENSATOR FÜR KLIMAANLAGE MIT SAMMLER MONTIERT AN HALTERUNG | [2000/14] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING CONDENSER COMPRISING A RESERVOIR MOUNTED ON A BASE | [2000/14] | French: | CONDENSEUR DE CLIMATISATION COMPRENANT UN RESERVOIR MONTE SUR UNE EMBASE | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 09.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 17.09.2003 | IT | 17.09.2003 | ES | 28.12.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/46] | GB | 17.09.2003 | |
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 17.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09184668 ; | [A]JPH0926282 ; | [DA]EP0480330 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 56 - column 23, line 8 *; | [A]EP0769666 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * column 6, line 21 - column 18, line 53 *; | [PA]EP0838642 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [PA] 1,12-17 * abstract ** column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 58 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 097, no. 011, & JP09184668 A 19970715 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 097, no. 005, & JP09026282 A 19970128 (SHOWA ALUM CORP) [A] 1,7-10 * abstract * |