EP1073374 - SUTURE ANCHOR WITH REVERSIBLE EXPANSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tornier Rue Doyen Gosse 38330 Saint-Ismier / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states TORNIER Rue Doyen Gosse 38330 Saint-Ismier / FR | ||
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states Tornier SA Rue du Doyen Gosse, BP 11 38330 Saint Ismier / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORNIER, Alain 299, chemin du Buttit F-38330 Saint Ismier / FR | 02 /
BONNOMET, François 23, rue de la Baronne d'Oberkirch Robertson F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2001/06] | Schmitt, John Roosevelt Consultants, 109, rue Sully, BP 6138 69466 Lyon Cédex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99914634.3 | 21.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999FR00941 | Priority number, date | FR19980005203 | 21.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9805203 | [2001/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953844 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073374 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073374 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, F16B13/06 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61F2/0811 (EP,US);
F16B13/061 (EP,US);
A61B17/8685 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0408 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61B2017/042 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0425 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [2001/06] | Title | German: | WIEDERLÖSBARER SPREIZANKER FÜR CHIRURGISCHEN NÄHFADEN | [2001/06] | English: | SUTURE ANCHOR WITH REVERSIBLE EXPANSION | [2001/06] | French: | ANCRE DE SUTURE A EXPANSION REVERSIBLE | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04029007.4 / EP1532930 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5472452 (TROTT ARTHUR F [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 32 - line 37; figure 13 *; | [DA]US5649963 (MCDEVITT DENNIS [US]) [DA] 1 * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 14; figure 12 *; | [Y]GB2173565 (HIMOUD HATIF) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 41 - line 44 * * page 1, line 76 - line 82; figure 2 *; | [DY]US5501695 (ANSPACH JR WILLIAM E [US], et al) [DY] 1,2 * column 5, line 13 - line 24; figure 11 * | by applicant | US5501695 | US5649963 |