EP1100440 - HAIR CARE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 2-PHENYLPROPYL-SUBSTITUTED POLYSILOXANE RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/21] | HAIR CARE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING POLYSILOXANE RESINS WITH DELOCALISED ELECTRONS | ||
[2006/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCANN, Chantelle Mary 88 Thorpe Lea Road Egham, Surrey TW20 8BN / GB | 02 /
McMEEKIN, Anthony 14A Fox Lane North Chertsey, Surrey KT16 9HW / GB | 03 /
McKELVEY, Graham Neil 37 Raglan Road, Knaphill Woking, Surrey GU21 2AR / GB | 04 /
YOUNG, Wendy, Victoria, Jane Pennymoor, Long Lane. Shaw Nr. Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2TA / GB | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Kohol, Sonia, et al Technical Centres Limited Procter & Gamble Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Kohol, Sonia, et al Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99914964.4 | 26.03.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999US06117 | Priority number, date | WO1998US15871 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: PCT/US98/15871 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0006105 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100440 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100440 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/891, A61Q5/00, A61Q5/12 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
A61K8/891 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q5/00 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/21] | A61K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Title | German: | HAARPFLEGEMITTEL DIE 2-PHENYLPROPYL-SUBSTITUIERTE POLYSILOXANHARZE ENTHALTEN | [2006/09] | English: | HAIR CARE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 2-PHENYLPROPYL-SUBSTITUTED POLYSILOXANE RESINS | [2006/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS CAPILLAIRES CONTENANT DES RESINES DE POLYSILOXANE SUBSTITUÉES PAR DU 2-PHENYLPROPYL | [2006/09] |
Former [2001/21] | HAARPFLEGEMITTEL DIE POLYSILOXANHARZE MIT DELOKALISIERTEN ELEKTRONEN ENTHALTEN | ||
Former [2001/21] | HAIR CARE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING POLYSILOXANE RESINS WITH DELOCALISED ELECTRONS | ||
Former [2001/21] | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS CAPILLAIRES CONTENANT DES RESINES DE POLYSILOXANE A ELECTRONS DELOCALISES | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2006 | BE | 06.09.2006 | CH | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | IT | 06.09.2006 | LI | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | ES | 17.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | IE | 26.03.2007 | LU | 26.03.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9216187 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1* example 5; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9408557 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 10, line 10 - line 22; page 3, line 25 - line 30; examples 6,7; claims 1,9 *; | [X]US5470551 (DUBIEF CLAUDE [FR], et al) [X] 1,3 * claims 1,2,15 *; | [DX]GB2297757 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DX] 1,3-5 * page 11, line 1 - line 20 ;; page 19; claims 1,13; table 7 *; | [A]WO9819654 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 23; claim 1 * |