EP1073952 - MULTI-TIERED INCREMENTAL SOFTWARE UPDATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYMANTEC CORPORATION 20330 Stevens Creek Boulevard Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2002/36] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states SYMANTEC CORPORATION 10201 Torre Avenue Cupertino, California 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALDIN, Ray, Soon 175 Bluxome 105 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
NACHENBERG, Carey 19585 Shadow Glen Circle Northridge, CA 91326 / US | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2001/06] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99915047.7 | 25.03.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999US06619 | Priority number, date | US19980047949 | 25.03.1998 Original published format: US 47949 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9949391 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1073952 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073952 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
G06F8/64 (EP,US);
G06F8/658 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/06] | Title | German: | VIELSCHICHTIGES INKREMENTALES AKTUALISIEREN VON SOFTWARE | [2001/06] | English: | MULTI-TIERED INCREMENTAL SOFTWARE UPDATING | [2001/06] | French: | MISE A JOUR DE LOGICIELS PAR INCREMENT A PLUSIEURS NIVEAUX | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9632679 (HIGHWAYMASTER COMM INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 22 *; | [A] - "USER-FRIENDLY INTERFACE FOR APPLYING SPECIFIC LEVELS OF COORDINATED UPDATES TO SOFTWARE IN THE FIELD", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19890301), vol. 31, no. 10, ISSN 0018-8689, page 258/259, XP000051138 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |