EP1068727 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR WEB-CASTING OVER DIGITAL BROADCAST TV NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liberate Technologies 2 Walnut Grove Horsham, PA 19044 / US | For all designated states Weidon, Mao 203 Salem Court No. 12 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | For all designated states Chen, David 78 S. Traymore Avenue Iveyland, PA 18974 / US | [2002/47] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Morecom, Inc. 2 Walnut Grove Horsham, PA 19044 / US | ||
For all designated states Weidon, Mao 203 Salem Court No. 12 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
For all designated states Chen, David 78 S. Traymore Avenue Iveyland, PA 18974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDON, Mao 203 Salem Court 12 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
CHEN, David 78 S. Traymore Avenue Iveyland, PA 18974 / US | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 99915184.8 | 31.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999US07146 | Priority number, date | US19980053562 | 01.04.1998 Original published format: US 53562 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951030 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068727 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/24 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N21/234336 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
H04N21/23617 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/858 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/03] | H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUT ÜBERTRAGUNG VON WEBINFORMATION ÜBER EIN DIGITALESFERNSEHRUNDFUNKNETZWERK | [2001/03] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR WEB-CASTING OVER DIGITAL BROADCAST TV NETWORK | [2001/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DIFFUSION WEB PAR UN RESEAU DE TELEVISION A DIFFUSION NUMERIQUE | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 02.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2005 | 31.03.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9800975 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,13-15,18-21,24-27,30-32 * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - line 38 * * page 3, line 6 - line 10 * * page 3, line 22 - line 37 * * page 5, line 11 - line 17 * * page 11, line 37 - page 12, line 4 * * page 20, line 7 - line 17 *; | [X] - ATZORI L ET AL, "MULTIMEDIA INFORMATION BROADCASTING USING DIGITAL TV CHANNELS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199712), vol. 43, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 383 - 392, XP000834832 [X] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/11.664021 | [X] - CLAUSEN H D ET AL, "MPEG-2 as a transmission system for Internet traffic", PERFORMANCE, COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS, 1998. IPCCC '98., IEEE INTERNATIONAL TEMPE/PHOENIX, AZ, USA 16-18 FEB. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980216), ISBN 0-7803-4468-5, pages 101 - 107, XP010270582 [X] 1,3-7,9-13,15-18,20-24,26-30,32-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.1] , [03.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PCCC.1998.659915 | [A] - THOMPSON V, "WEBCASTING OVER THE AIR", BYTE, MCGRAW-HILL INC. ST PETERBOROUGH, US, (19980301), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0360-5280, pages 40IS11 - 40IS14, XP000773959 [A] 1-34 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO9712486 (BOSTON TECH INC [US]) |