EP1064240 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING WASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEHRLE-WERK AG Bismarckstrasse 1-11 D-79312 Emmendingen / DE | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBERG, Volker Christian-Kiefer-Weg 13 D-79312 Emmendingen / DE | 02 /
SCHALK, Peter Richard-Wagner-Strasse 5 D-79331 Teningen / DE | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/01] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99915502.1 | 06.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999DE00601 | Priority number, date | DE1998111944 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19811944 | DE1998146336 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19846336 | [2001/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947473 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064240 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C05F17/00, C05F9/00, B09B1/00 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B03B9/06 (EP);
B09B3/00 (EP);
C05F17/50 (EP);
C05F9/00 (EP);
Y02A40/20 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C05F9/00, C05F9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN SOWIE ANLAGE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABFÄLLEN | [2001/01] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING WASTE | [2001/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR TRAITER DES DECHETS | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 30.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.03.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0784039 (AN MASCHINENBAU UND UMWELTSCHU [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,10,12,14-20,23,24 * claim - * * column 1, line 50 - column 7, line 19 * [A] 3,5,8; | [A]US4342650 (ERICKSON LENNART G, et al) [A] 1-24 * claim - * * column 2, line 7 - line 68 * * column 5, line 52 - column 12, line 50 *; | [A]NL9302124 ; | [A]EP0628526 (STRAP SRL [IT]) [A] 1-3,7,8,23,24 * claim - * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 41, Database accession no. 95-318745, XP002109881 & NL9302124 A 19950703 (LINATEX NEDERLAND BV) [A] 1-24 * abstract * |