EP1071581 - GROMMET AND CONNECTOR SEAL FOR USE WITH FLAT FLEXIBLE CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lear Automotive Dearborn, Inc. 21557 Telegraph Road Southfield, MI 48034 / US | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Nathan, J. 23630 Marshall Street Dearborn, MI 48124 / US | 02 /
BERELS, David, J. 8808 Quail Circle Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, New Priestgate House, 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [2001/05] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99916367.8 | 05.04.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US07438 | Priority number, date | US19980061395 | 16.04.1998 Original published format: US 61395 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952743 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071581 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071581 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
B60R16/0207 (EP,US);
B60R16/0222 (EP,US);
H01R13/5216 (EP,US);
H02G3/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/05] | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNGSTÜLLE UND VERBINDER ZUM VERWENDEN MIT EINEM FLEXIBLEN FLACHKABEL | [2001/05] | English: | GROMMET AND CONNECTOR SEAL FOR USE WITH FLAT FLEXIBLE CABLE | [2001/05] | French: | PASSE-CABLE ET JOINT D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR CABLE SOUPLE PLAT | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH05300629 ; | [A]JPH09134630 ; | [Y]US4662692 (UKEN WILLIAM D [US], et al) [Y] 9-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2663791 (TECNOFFRA) [Y] 12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5109458 (DIXIT MAYANKKUMAR M [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0534659 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 9-12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2289871 (KANSEI KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,6 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 3, line 15 - page 7, line 5 * * page 9, line 23 - page 11, line 7 ** page 16, line 22 - page 18, line 26; figures 1-5,8,10-18 *; | [A]WO9629760 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) [A] 12 * page 11, line 16 - page 15, line 24; figures 1-35 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940218), vol. 018, no. 102, Database accession no. (E - 1511), & JP05300629 A 19931112 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 097, no. 009, & JP09134630 A 19970520 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD) [A] 1-3,7 * abstract * |