EP1078115 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING IMPENDING ANODE EFFECT IN ALUMINUM REDUCTION CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaiser Aluminium & Chemical Corporation 6177 Sunol Boulevard Pleasanton, CA 94566-7769 / US | [2001/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, David, G. E. 409 Shore Road Nine Mile Falls, WA 99026 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99916546.7 | 08.04.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US07779 | Priority number, date | US19980070223 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: US 70223 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957336 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078115 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/20 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
C25C3/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VORHERSAGEN EINES BEVORSTEHENDEN ANODENEFFEKTES IN EINER ALUMINIUM-REDUKTIONSZELLE | [2001/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING IMPENDING ANODE EFFECT IN ALUMINUM REDUCTION CELLS | [2001/09] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PREDICTION D'EFFET IMMINENT D'ANODE DANS DES CUVES D'ELECTROLYSE D'ALUMINIUM | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/43] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1482982 | [A] - G.G. ARALBAYEVA, "Prediction from spectral characteristics based on the gmdh algorithm of the anode effect in aluminum electrolyzer", SOVIET JOURNAL OF AUTOMATION AND INFORMATION SCIENCES, (1987), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 39 - 45, XP002110106 [A] 1 * see complete text * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 89-355325, XP002110107 & SU1482982 A 19890530 (AS TADZ. MATH. COMPUT.) [A] 1 * abstract * |