EP1094730 - STRAP-ATTACHED SPUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herm. Sprenger GmbH & Co. KG Alexanderstrasse 10-21 58644 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states HERM. SPRENGER GmbH & Co. KG Alexanderstrasse 10-21 D-58644 Iserlohn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALKENHOL, Klaus Höven 92 D-48720 Rosendahl / DE | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 99916749.7 | 18.02.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999DE00446 | Priority number, date | DE19982011754U | 03.07.1998 Original published format: DE 29811754 U | DE19982011838U | 06.07.1998 Original published format: DE 29811838 U | [2001/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001268 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094730 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094730 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A43C17/02 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
A43C17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | SPORENBÜGEL MIT RIEMENBEFESTIGUNG | [2001/18] | English: | STRAP-ATTACHED SPUR | [2001/18] | French: | EPERON A FIXATION PAR COURROIES | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2006/31] | FR | 11.12.2002 | |
Former [2004/10] | FR | 01.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US969839 (BUERMANN GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US1882059 (BOOS FRANCIS H) [A] 1-6,8* the whole document *; | [X]US5450712 (VAN SCOYK PERSHING R [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8 * figures 2,3 * * column 5, line 19 - line 33 * * figures 2,3 * |