EP1074025 - X-RAY CONCENTRATOR AND X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/06] | X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM | ||
[2005/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smithsonian Astrophysical Observatory 60 Garden Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2001/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVER, Eric, H. 59 Maple Street Needham, MA 02192 / US | 02 /
SCHNOPPER, Herbert, W. 112A Lakeview Avenue Cambridge, MA 02192 / US | 03 /
INGRAM, Russell 6 Woodcliff Road Canton, MA 02021 / US | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99917580.5 | 16.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999US08394 | Priority number, date | US19980064476 | 22.04.1998 Original published format: US 64476 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9953823 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1074025 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074025 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G21K1/06 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
G03F7/70166 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2001/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BÜNDELUNG VON RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN UND RÖNTGENDIAGNOSTIKANLAGE | [2005/12] | English: | X-RAY CONCENTRATOR AND X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM | [2005/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF FOCALISEUR DE RAYONS X ET INSTALLATION DE DIAGNOSTIC PAR RAYONS X | [2005/12] |
Former [2001/06] | RÖNTGENDIAGNOSTIKANLAGE | ||
Former [2001/06] | X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM | ||
Former [2001/06] | SYSTEME DE DIAGNOSTIC AUX RAYONS X | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 27.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2002 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2007 | 30.04.2009 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | IE | 16.04.2012 | [2013/22] |
Former [2013/08] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 20.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS60262338 ; | [PX]WO9909401 (HARA DAVID B O [US]) [PX] 1,3,8,9,42 * page 4, line 11 - line 28 * * page 5, line 29 - page 7, line 6 ** figures 2,4-6 *; | [XY] - KANTSYREV V P ET AL, "INVESTIGATING THE CHARACTERISTICS OF X RADIATION FROM A HOT PLASMA BY MEANS OF GLASSCAPILLARY CONVERTERS", QUANTUM ELECTRONICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, WOODBURY, NY, (19931201), vol. 23, no. 12, ISSN 1063-7818, pages 1026 - 1029, XP000471590 [X] 1,4,8,37-39 * page 1026, paragraph 1 - page 1027, paragraph 1; figure 2 * [Y] 2,3,5-7,42,44 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/QE1993v023n12ABEH003277 | [XA] - KANTSYREV V L ET AL, "POSSIBLE USE OF GLASS-CAPILLARY CONCENTRATORS OF SOFT X RAYS IN STUDIES OF HIGH-TEMPERATURE PLASMAS", TECHNICAL PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19930401), vol. 19, no. 4, ISSN 1063-7850, pages 205 - 206, XP000395006 [X] 1,4,8,37,38 * page 205, column L, paragraph 1 - paragraph L * [A] 44,45 | [X] - KANTSYREV V ET AL, "ENHANCEMENT OF THE FLUX DENSITY OF LINE RADIATION IN THE EXTREME ULTRAVIOLET WAVELENGTH REGION FOR SPECTROSCOPIC AND PLASMA DISGNOSTIC APPLICATIONS USING GLASS-CAPILLARY CONVERTERS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19950626), vol. 66, no. 26, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3567 - 3569, XP000520507 [X] 1 * page 3567, paragraph 2 - page 3568, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.113789 | [YA] - DECKMAN H W ET AL, "Use of a scanning electron microscope as an X-ray source for EXAFS", WORKSHOP ON LABORATORY EXAFS FACILITIES AND THEIR RELATION TO SYNCHROTRON RADIATION SOURCES, SEATTLE, WA, USA, 28-30 APRIL 1980, AIP Conference Proceedings, 1980, USA, no. 64, ISSN 0094-243X, pages 91 - 92, XP000909065 [Y] 2,44 * the whole document * [A] 47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.1150180117 | [Y] - ZOREV N N, "X-ray optics for plasma point sources", X-RAY INSTRUMENTATION IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, PLASMA PHYSICS, ASTROPHYSICS AND SYNCHROTRON RADIATION, PARIS, FRANCE, 25-28 APRIL 1989, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1989, USA, vol. 1140, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 214 - 219, XP000909066 [Y] 3 * page 214, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * | [Y] - PEARLMAN J S ET AL, "Bright discharge plasma sources for X-ray lithography", ELECTRON BEAM, X-RAY, AND ION-BEAM TECHNIQUES FOR SUBMICROMETER LITHOGRAPHIES IV, SANTA CLARA, CA, USA, 14-15 MARCH 1985, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1985, USA, vol. 537, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 102 - 107, XP000909059 [Y] 5 * page 103, paragraph 2 - paragraph L * | [PY] - MILEY G H, "A portable neutron/tunable X-ray source based on inertial electrostatic confinement", NINTH SYMPOSIUM ON RADIATION MEASUREMENTS AND APPLICATIONS, ANN ARBOR, MI, USA, 11-14 MAY 1998, Nuclear Instruments & Methods in Physics Research, Section A (Accelerators, Spectrometers, Detectors and Associated Equipment), 11 Feb. 1999, Elsevier, Netherlands, vol. 422, no. 1-3, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 16 - 20, XP002138043 [PY] 6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860517), vol. 010, no. 133, Database accession no. (E - 404), & JP60262338 A 19851225 (FUJITSU KK) [Y] 7 * abstract * | [Y] - O'HARA D, "X-ray flux concentrating optics for improving the performance of light element energy dispersive spectroscopy", X-RAY AND ULTRAVIOLET SPECTROSCOPY AND POLARIMETRY II, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 23-24 JULY 1998, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1998, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 3443, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 98 - 104, XP000909055 [Y] 42 * page 99, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.333603 | [A] - DUVANOV B N ET AL, "MULTIELEMENT X-RAY CONCENTRATOR", SOVIET PHYSICS TECHNICAL PHYSICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19930401), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 334 - 337, XP000443319 [A] 30,47 * page 335, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 * | Examination | - SERLEMITSOS P.J., "Conical foil X-ray mirrors: performance and projections", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (19880415), vol. 27, no. 8, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 1447 - 1452, XP009126058 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.27.001447 | - PETER J. SERLEMITSOS; YANG SOONG, "Foil X-Ray Mirrors", ASTROPHYSICS AND SPACE SCIENCE, REIDEL, DORDRECHT, NL, (19960901), vol. 239, no. 2, ISSN 0004-640X, pages 177 - 196, XP009125725 | - CHRISTENSEN F.E. ET AL, "Studies of multilayers and thin-foil X-ray mirrors using a soft X-ray diffractometer", JOURNAL OF X-RAY SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOS PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0895-3996(90)90003-5, vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 0895-3996, (19900601), pages 81 - 94, (19900601), XP023024961 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0895-3996(90)90003-5 | - SERLEMITSOS P.J. ET AL, "THE MULTILAYER OPTION FOR CONICAL FOIL X-RAY MIRRORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING (SPIE), SPIE, USA LNKD- DOI:10.1117/12.278853, (19970727), vol. 3113, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 244 - 252, XP000961464 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.278853 |