EP1073446 - SKIN WHITENING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVON PRODUCTS, INC. 1251 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10020-1196 / US | [2001/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KYROU, Christos, D. 6 Cara Court Goshen, NY 10924 / US | 02 /
SIMPSON, Susan, E. 349 Wyckoff Avenue Wyckoff, NJ 07481 / US | 03 /
PTCHELINTSEV, Dimitri 1 Second Street Jersey City, New Jersey 07302 / US | 04 /
MARTIN, Dennis, M. 8 Tenney Lane Cornwall, NY 12518 / US | 05 /
TEAL, Janice 93 Easton Road Westport, CT 06880 / US | [2007/06] |
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
KYROU, Christos, D. 6 Cara Court Goshen, NY 10924 / US | ||
02 /
SIMPSON, Susan, E. 349 Wyckoff Avenue Wyckoff, NJ 07481 / US | |||
03 /
PTCHELINTSEV, Dmitri 668 Juniper Way Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | |||
04 /
MARTIN, Dennis, M. 8 Tenney Lane Cornwall, NY 12518 / US | |||
05 /
TEAL, Janice 93 Easton Road Westport, CT 06880 / US | |||
Former [2001/06] | 01 /
KYROU, Christos, D. Apartment 80 Parkside Drive Suffern, NY 10901 / US | ||
02 /
SIMPSON, Susan, E. 349 Wyckoff Avenue Wyckoff, NJ 07481 / US | |||
03 /
PTCHELINTSEV, Dmitri 668 Juniper Way Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | |||
04 /
MARTIN, Dennis, M. 8 Tenney Lane Cornwall, NY 12518 / US | |||
05 /
TEAL, Janice 40 Forest Avenue Old Greenwich, CT 06870 / US | Representative(s) | Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, et al Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, et al Dr. Weitzel & Partner, Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2001/06] | Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner, Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99917666.2 | 26.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999US09006 | Priority number, date | US19980083528P | 29.04.1998 Original published format: US 83528 P | US19980109107 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: US 109107 | US19990227943 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: US 227943 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955352 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073446 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073446 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/02, A61Q17/04, A61K8/35 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/0229 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/36 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/494 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K8/671 (EP,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/06] | A61K35/78, A61K7/42, A61K7/035 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/06] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HAUTBLEICHUNG | [2001/06] | English: | SKIN WHITENING COMPOSITION | [2001/06] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ECLAIRCISSEMENT DE LA PEAU | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06128133 ; | [Y]FR2655054 (PACIFIC CHEM CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,35* claims 1-3 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 23, Database accession no. 1994-188874, XP002337588 & JPH06128133 A 19940510 (KOBE STEEL) [Y] 1,35 * column A * | International search | [X]GB2259014 (FISCHER PHARMA LTD [IL]); | [Y]JPH06305932 (MARUZEN PHARMA); | [Y]US5407677 (TOMINAGA NAOKI [JP], et al); | [X]WO9619180 (MAYBELLINE INTERMEDIATE CORP [US]); | [Y]US5560917 (COHEN KENNETH A [US], et al); | [YP]US5834513 (PTCHELINTSEV DMITRI [US], et al) |