EP1080349 - FLUID TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lattice Intellectual Property Limited 1-3 Strand London WC2N 5EH / GB | [2004/22] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Lattice Intellectual Property Limited 130 Jermyn Street London SW1Y 4UR / GB | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states BG Transco PLC 100 Thames Valley Park Drive Reading, Berkshire RG6 1PT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHWORTH, Roger Philip 6 Grassholme Drive Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 0NS / GB | 02 /
HARPER, Mark 103 Blinco Grove Cambridge CB1 4TX / GB | [2004/02] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
ASHWORTH, Roger Philip 6 Grassholme Drive Loughbo rough, Leicestershire LE11 0NS / GB | ||
02 /
HARPER, Mark 103 Blinco Grove Cambridge CB1 4TX / GB | Representative(s) | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Squire Sanders (UK) LLP 7 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Kunz, Herbert, et al Hammonds LLP Karl-Scharnagl-Ring 7 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | Kunz, Herbert, Dr., et al Hammonds Rechtsanwälte/Patentanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 17 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | Illingworth-Law, William Lattice Intellectual Property Ltd 23 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6LB / GB | ||
Former [2001/10] | Illingworth-Law, William BG Intellectual Property Ltd., 100 Thames Valley Park Drive Reading, Berks RG6 1PT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99918125.8 | 21.04.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999GB01209 | Priority number, date | GB19980009375 | 02.05.1998 Original published format: GB 9809375 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957530 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080349 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080349 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01K11/24 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G01K11/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | MESSUNG DER TEMPERATUR EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2004/02] | English: | FLUID TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT | [2001/10] | French: | MESURE DE LA TEMPERATURE DE LIQUIDES | [2001/10] |
Former [2001/10] | MESSUNG DER TEMPERATUR EINES FLÜSSIGKEITS | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 28.12.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 12.01.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.03.2005 | FR | 02.03.2005 | IT | 02.03.2005 | NL | 02.03.2005 | GB | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | DE | 03.06.2005 | ES | 13.06.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/35] | BE | 02.03.2005 | |
FR | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
GB | 02.06.2005 | ||
DE | 03.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | BE | 02.03.2005 | |
FR | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DE | 03.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | BE | 02.03.2005 | |
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DE | 03.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 02.03.2005 | |
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BE | 02.03.2005 | |
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 02.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3137169 (CLEMENT WARREN F, et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,13-15,17,18,22,24,25,29-31,34-37 * figures 3-6 *; | [A]WO8805530 (SAIPEM AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 1-3,10,20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9300577 (ENTE NAZ ENERGIA ELETTRICA [IT], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7,13,15-17,22,25,29,31 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9004766 (HERAEUS SENSOR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,6 * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 27 *; | [A]JPH0783726 ; | [A]US4445389 (POTZICK JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5421212 (MAEYRAENEN TARMO [FI], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 095, no. 006, & JP07083726 A 19950331 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |