EP1082195 - CUTTING DISK WITH VIBRATION DAMPING SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/11] | VIBRATION DAMPING SHEET FOR CUTTING DISKS | ||
[2003/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Porfidi International S.r.L Loc. Mochena, 4/A 38045 Civezzano (TN) / IT | [2002/23] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Profidi International s.r.l Loc. Mochena, 4/A 38045 Civezzano / IT | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Profidi International s.r.l Loc. Mochena, 4/A 38045 Civezzano / IT | ||
For all designated states Visentin, Daniela Via Torre d'Augusto, 38 38100 Trento / IT | |||
For all designated states Pareti, Vittorio Piazza 25 Aprile, 1 37180 Verona / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARETI, Vittorio Piazza 25 Aprile, 1 I-37180 Verona / IT | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria C/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via Perathoner 31 39100 Bolzano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria c/o Bugnion S.p.A., Via Perathoner 31 39100 Bolzano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99918225.6 | 20.05.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999IB00901 | Priority number, date | IT1998PR00035 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: IT PR980035 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9961204 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082195 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1082195 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/34, B24D5/12, B23D47/00, B23D61/02, B24B45/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
B24D3/34 (EP);
B23D47/005 (EP);
B23D61/026 (EP);
B24D5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, PT [2001/11] | Extension states | RO | 29.11.2000 | Title | German: | SCHNEIDESCHEIBE MIT SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFENDER FOLIE | [2003/14] | English: | CUTTING DISK WITH VIBRATION DAMPING SHEET | [2003/14] | French: | DISQUE DE COUPE AVEC FEUILLE D'AMORTISSEMENT DE VIBRATIONS | [2003/14] |
Former [2001/11] | SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFENDE FOLIEN FÜR SCHNEIDESCHEIBE | ||
Former [2001/11] | VIBRATION DAMPING SHEET FOR CUTTING DISKS | ||
Former [2001/11] | FEUILLE D'AMORTISSEMENT DE VIBRATIONS DESTINEE A DES DISQUES DE COUPE | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2003 | BE | 27.08.2003 | CH | 27.08.2003 | LI | 27.08.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/22] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 27.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH079346 ; | [A]US3793783 (PATERNO J, et al) [A] 2,4* abstract *; | [A]EP0523260 (MUMMENHOFF HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 12, line 36 - column 14, line 10; figure 20 *; | [A]US5408983 (SAWLUK WLODZIMIERZ [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 24 - line 41 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 095, no. 004, & JP07009346 A 19950113 (OSAKA DIAMOND IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * |