EP1075513 - CONTINUOUS IN VITRO EVOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cephalon Australia (VIC) Pty Ltd. Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park NSW 2113 / AU | [2010/35] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Diatech Pty. Ltd. GPO Box 2434 Brisbane, QLD 4001 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COIA, Gregory 73 Union Street Brunswick, VIC 3056 / AU | 02 /
HUDSON, Peter, John 36 Fuschia Street Blackburn, VIC 3130 / AU | 03 /
ILIADES, Peter 14 Robert Street North Balwyn, VIC 3104 / AU | 04 /
IRVING, Robert, Alexander 11 Honeysuckle Avenue Mulgrave, VIC 3170 / AU | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Elsy, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Elsy, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2001/07] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99918964.0 | 07.05.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999AU00341 | Priority number, date | AU1998PP03445 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: AU PP344598 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958661 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1075513 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1075513 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1075513 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/01, C12P21/00, C12Q1/68, C12N15/10 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
C12N9/127 (EP,US);
C07K16/082 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/1041 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/07] | C12N15/01, C12N15/09, C12P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHE IN VITRO-EVOLUTION. | [2001/07] | English: | CONTINUOUS IN VITRO EVOLUTION | [2001/07] | French: | EVOLUTION CONTINUE IN VITRO | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 06.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10151958.5 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 29.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | BE | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | IE | 07.05.2011 | LU | 07.05.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/20] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
IE | 07.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5643768 (KAWASAKI GLENN H [US]) [X] 28 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 29 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 35 * * column 7, line 19 - column 8, line 19 * * column 11, line 15 - line 26 * * column 15, line 29 - line 44; claims 1-31 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 58 * [Y] 1-26; | [XY] - HANES J & PLÜCKTHUN A, "In vitro selection and evolution of functional proteins by using ribosome display", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, no. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4937 - 4942, XP002077149 [X] 28 * abstract * * page 4938, column 2, paragraph 6 - page 4939, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 4940, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 4941, column 2, paragraph 1; figures 1,4; table 1 * [Y] 1-26 | [AD] - LIZARDI P M ET AL, "EXPONENTIAL AMPLIFICATION OF RECOMBINANT-RNA HYBRIDIZATION PROBES", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING CO. NEW YORK, US, (19881001), vol. 6, ISSN 0733-222X, pages 1197 - 1202, XP000647526 [AD] 21-26 * page 1201, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1088-1197 | International search | [X]WO9406928 (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]); | [X]US5602001 (KRAMER FRED R [US], et al) | [Y] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., 93, (1996), BROWN D. and GOLD L., "RNA Replication by Qbeta Replicase: A Working Model", pages 11558-11562. | [X] - J. BIOL. CHEM., 269(2), (1994), RYABOVA L. et al., "Coupled Replication-Translation of Amplifiable Messenger RNA", pages 1501-1505. | [X] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., 90, (1993), MOROZOV I.Y. et al., "Synergism in Replication and Translation of Messenger RNA in a Cell-Free System", pages 9325-9329. | [A] - J. MOL. BIOL., 249, (1995), ROHDE N. et al., "The Mutant Distribution of an RNA Species Replicated by Qbeta Replicase", pages 756-762. | [A] - BIOPHYS. CHEM., 66, (1997), BIEBRICHER C.K. and GARDINER W.C., "Molecular Evolution of RNA In Vitro", pages 179-192. |