EP1067992 - CATCHING DEVICE FOR A SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING PERSONS WORKING AT HEIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Christian Dalloz Holding Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Seligenweg 10 95028 Hof / DE | [2002/14] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states SÖLL GMBH Seligenweg 10 95028 Hof / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKADE, Toralf Am Torbogen 9 D-01237 Dresden / DE | 02 /
MICKAN, Ronald Am Mittelfeld 2e D-01640 Coswig / DE | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Gritschneder, Martin Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Gritschneder, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99919153.9 | 29.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999EP02137 | Priority number, date | DE1998205788U | 30.03.1998 Original published format: DE 29805788 U | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949939 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067992 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067992 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/04 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
A62B35/04 (EP,US);
F16B2200/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | FANGEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN STEIGSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2001/03] | English: | CATCHING DEVICE FOR A SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING PERSONS WORKING AT HEIGHTS | [2001/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE POUR SYSTEME DE PROTECTION LORS D'ASCENSIONS | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 22.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2555060 (VIRTARADAT OY [FI]) [AD] 1-8 * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 35; figure - *; | [A]US5224427 (RICHES DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 67 - column 9, line 44; figure - *; | [AD]DE29501716U (SOELL GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 37; figure - *; | [A]WO9529738 (SMALL GREGORY ERIC [CA]) [A] 1-8 * column 11, paragraph L - column 30, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]WO9532759 (LATCHWAYS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8* page 4, line 30 - page 7, line 18; figure - * | by applicant | DE2637593 | DE3426551 | DE29501716U | DE29501761U |