EP1068575 - GLOBAL INPUT/OUTPUT SUPPORT FOR A MESH CONNECTED COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2001/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABERCROMBIE, Andrew, P. 719 Cornwall Road Winter Park, FL 32792 / US | 02 /
SUTHA, Surachai 8907 Oriente Street Orlando, FL 32825 / US | 03 /
HOLSZTYNSKI, Wlodzimierz Apartment 11, 4175 Chester Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99919764.3 | 09.04.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999US07001 | Priority number, date | US19980057468 | 09.04.1998 Original published format: US 57468 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953412 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068575 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/80 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
G06F15/8023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Extension states | AL | 18.10.2000 | LT | 18.10.2000 | LV | 18.10.2000 | MK | 18.10.2000 | RO | 18.10.2000 | SI | 18.10.2000 | Title | German: | GLOBALE EINGANG-/AUSGANGSUNTERSTÜTZUNG FÜR EINEN MASCHENRECHNER | [2001/03] | English: | GLOBAL INPUT/OUTPUT SUPPORT FOR A MESH CONNECTED COMPUTER | [2001/03] | French: | SUPPORT GLOBAL D'ENTREE/SORTIE ORDINATEUR A ARCHITECTURE EN RESEAU | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9608778 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [A] 1,11,13,23 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 5 * * page 30, line 8 - page 32, line 7 *; | [A]EP0256661 (ACTIVE MEMORY TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 2,5,11,12,19,21,23,24 * page 2, line 46 - page 5, line 16 *; | [A] - WEEMS C C, "REAL-TIME CONSIDERATIONS IN THE DESIGN OF THE IMAGE UNDERSTANDING ARCHITECTURE", REAL-TIME IMAGING, (19961201), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 1077-2014, pages 341 - 350, XP000656195 [A] 1,2,5,11-13,19,21,23,24 * page 343, column R, line 29 - line 47 * * page 345, column R, line 10 - line 30 * * page 346, column R, line 7 - line 26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/rtim.1996.0035 | [A] - HUNGWEN LI ET AL, "RECONFIGURABLE SIMD MASSIVELY PARALLEL COMPUTERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (19910401), vol. 79, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 429 - 443, XP000238523 [A] 1,11,13,23 * page 435, paragraph A * * page 436, paragraph B.2 - page 437 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.92038 | [A] - WEEMS C C ET AL, "IMAGE UNDERSTANDING ARCHITECTURE: EXPLOITING POTENTIAL PARALLELISM IN MACHINE VISION", COMPUTER, (19920201), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 65 - 68, XP000287538 [A] 1,11,13,23 * page 66, column L, line 22 - column R, line 6 * * page 30, line 8 - page 32, line 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.121476 |