EP1145558 - SYSTEM FOR EDITING COMPRESSED IMAGE SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEE, Susie, J. 750 N. Shoreline Boulevard 32 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
VASUDEV, Bhaskaran 375 Anna Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99919988.8 | 23.04.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999US08886 | Priority number, date | US19980069596 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: US 69596 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9956471 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1145558 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145558 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/036 (EP,US);
H04N19/40 (EP,US);
H04N21/23424 (EP,US);
H04N21/2343 (EP,US);
H04N21/238 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM EDITIEREN KOMPRIMIERTER BILDSEQUENZEN | [2001/42] | English: | SYSTEM FOR EDITING COMPRESSED IMAGE SEQUENCES | [2001/42] | French: | SYSTEME DE MISE EN FORME DE SEQUENCES D'IMAGES COMPRIMEES | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.01.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0656729 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,7,9,14,15,19 * page 6, column 9, line 48 - page 7, column 11, line 56 *; | [XA] - WEE ET AL, "Splicing MPEG Video Streams in the Compressed Domain", IEEE WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, (19970623), pages 225 - 230, XP002081482 [X] 1-5,7-11,14-17,19-22 * the whole document * [A] 13,18 | [DXA] - S WEE, B VASUDEV, "Splicing MPEG video streams in the compressed domain", HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, (1997), XP002119777 [DX] 1-5,7-11,14-17,19-22 * the whole document * [A] 13,18 | [A] - MCGRATH E, "DIGITAL INSERTION OF ADVERTISING INTO A DIGITAL STREAM (DID)", INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CONVENTION, (199709), pages 258 - 261, XP000668975 [A] 9,10 * the whole document * |