EP1076697 - SEMAPHORIN POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunex Corporation One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | ||
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION 51 University Street Seattle Washington 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRIGGS, Melanie, K. 2256 12th Avenue West Seattle, WA 98119 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99920356.5 | 05.05.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999US09831 | Priority number, date | US19980085497P | 14.05.1998 Original published format: US 85497 P | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9958676 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1076697 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076697 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, A61K38/17, C07K16/18, C12N15/62 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | SEMAPHORIN POLYPEPTIDE | [2001/08] | English: | SEMAPHORIN POLYPEPTIDES | [2001/08] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE SEMAPHORINE | [2001/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 02.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2008 | BE | 17.09.2008 | CY | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | NL | 17.09.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | PT | 17.02.2009 | IE | 05.05.2009 | LU | 05.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 05.05.2009 | ||
LU | 05.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 05.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0892047 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL DE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-14,16,18-23 * 99.95% identity in a 2001 BP overlap between SEQ ID NO 1 of EP892047 and SEQ ID 1 of the application * * examples 8,9 *; | [E]WO9945114 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [E] 1-16,19-23 * 99.75% identity in a 2001 BP overlap between SEQ ID NO 1 of WO9945114 and SEQ ID NO 1 of the application * * example 4 *; | [PX] - YAMADA A ET AL, "Molecular cloning of a glycosylphosphatidylinositol-anchored molecule CDw108", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY., THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE., US, (19990401), vol. 162, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4094 - 4100, XP002123609 [PX] 1-14,16,19-23 * 99.8% identity in 2001 BP overlap between the sequence in figure 1 and SEQ ID NO 1 * * page 40094, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [PX] - XU X ET AL, "Human semaphorin K1 is glycosylphosphatidylinositol-linked and defines a new subfamily of viral-related semaphorins", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD., US, (19980828), vol. 273, no. 35, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 22428 - 22434, XP002113886 [PX] 1-14,19-23 * abstract * * the sequence of sema K1 in figure 1 corresponds to seq ID NO 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.35.22428 | [PX] - LANGE C ET AL, "New eukaryotic semaphorins with close homology to semaphorins of viruses", GENOMICS, SAN DIEGO., US, (19980801), vol. 51, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 340 - 350, XP002113887 [PX] 1-14,19-23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1998.5256 | [XA] - ENSSER A ET AL, "Alcephaline herpesvirus type 1 has a semaphorin-like gene", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY., SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, READING., GB, (1995), vol. 76, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 1063 - 1067, XP002113888 [X] 17 * the whole document * [A] 1 | Examination | WO9921997 | - COMEAU M.R. ET AL, "A Poxvirus-Encoded Semaphorin Induces Cytokine Production from Monocytes and Binds to a Novel Cellular Semaphorin Receptor, VESPR", IMMUNITY, (199804), vol. 8, pages 473 - 482, XP000945259 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80552-X |