EP1077655 - STENT PLACEMENT AND RETRIEVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIU Biomedical Innovations (Urology) Inc. Suite 678-1333 West Broadway Vancouver, B.C. V6H 4C1 / CA | [2003/02] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Taylor, William N. 5941 Chancellor Boulevard Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1E6 / CA | ||
For all designated states McDougall, Ian 821 East 17th Street North Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 2X2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, William N. 5941 Chancellor Boulevard Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1E6 / CA | 02 /
McDougall, Ian 821 East 17th Street North Vancouver British Columbia V7L 2X2 / CA | [2003/02] |
Former [2001/09] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2001/09] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99920468.8 | 07.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999CA00405 | Priority number, date | US19980074991 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: US 74991 | US19980087375 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87375 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958083 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077655 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1077655 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/04, A61F2/06, A61F6/18 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A61F2/04 (EP);
A61M27/008 (EP);
A61F2/94 (EP);
A61F2/95 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/09] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM EINSETZEN UND ENTFERNEN EINES STENTS | [2001/09] | English: | STENT PLACEMENT AND RETRIEVAL | [2001/09] | French: | MISE EN PLACE ET RETRAIT D'UNE SONDE | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0276104 (AMERICAN MED SYST) [X] 1 * column 7, line 15 - line 31; figures 1,4; claims 18-20 * [A] 2,11-13,21,23,25,28,39,46,48,49; | [A]US4790809 (KUNTZ DAVID H) [A] 1,12,21,23,25 * abstract *; | [A]US4727866 (LIVESAY BILLY R ET AL) [A] 1,11,12,28 * abstract *; | [A]US3908646 (ANSARI AMIR H) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5116309 (COLL MILTON E) [A] 1 * column 3, line 47 - line 49; figure 4 *; | [A]FR2577809 (SYNTHELABO) [A] 1 * abstract * |