EP1131503 - SECURITY ROOM FOR INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY FACILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lampertz GmbH & Co. KG In der Aue 2 57584 Wallmenroth / DE | [2004/26] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Otto Lampertz GmbH & Co. KG In der Aue 2 57584 Wallmenroth / DE | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Otto Lampertz GmbH & Co. Kg. In der Aue 2 57584 Wallmenroth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRASE, Hans-Jürgen Hohe Strasse 12 D-57520 Niederdreisbach / DE | 02 /
BÄHNER, Martin Industriestrasse 50 D-57518 Betzdorf / DE | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 99920712.9 | 20.04.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999EP02637 | Priority number, date | DE19981052927 | 17.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19852927 | [2001/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029685 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131503 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1131503 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/94, E04H1/12, E04B1/61 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
G06F1/16 (EP,US);
E04B1/6116 (EP,US);
E04H1/1261 (EP,US);
E04H2005/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2001/37] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSRAUM FÜR INFORMATIONSTECHNISCHE EINRICHTUNGEN | [2001/37] | English: | SECURITY ROOM FOR INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY FACILITIES | [2001/37] | French: | LOCAL DE SECURITE POUR INSTALLATIONS INFORMATIQUES | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB504255 (NEWCON IND LTD, et al) [A] 8 * page 4, line 26 - line 37 * * page 4, line 81 - line 89; figure 4 *; | [YA]DE7712671U (M-T VERRIEGELUNGSTECHNIK VORRICHTUNGS- BAU- UND HANDELS-GMBH) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 30; figures 6-10 * [A] 5; | [A]GB1516589 (CLARK DOOR CO INC) [A] 9 * page 1, line 96 - page 2, line 51 ** page 2, line 73 - line 108; figure - *; | [A]US4455801 (MERRITT W R [CA]) [A] 6 * column 1, line 52 - line 56; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3718911 (WREDE & NIEDECKEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 7,8,10 * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 58; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]EP0458560 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 1 * * column 5, line 26 - line 32; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0541506 (IES A P LES ERABLES B W [BE]) [A] 7 * column 4, line 12 - line 57; figures 1-4 * |