EP1076981 - Mobile telephone with camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/08] | MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS | ||
[2004/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORANGE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES LIMITED St. James Court Great Park Road Almondsbury Park Bristol BS12 4QJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Orange Personal Communications Services Limited St. James Court Great Park Road Almondsbury Park Bristol BS12 4QJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Orange Personal Communications Services Ltd. St. James Court, Great Park Road, Almondsbury Park Bradley Stoke, Bristol BS12 4QJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIESTMAN, Paul 19 Pembridge Mews London W11 3EQ / GB | 02 /
KING, Oliver 35 Tewkesbury Terrace London NLL 2LT / GB | 03 /
LEWIS, Sean Flat 4 88 Chepstow Road London W2 5QP / GB | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Spaargaren, Jerome Electronic Intellectual Property Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Spaargaren, Jerome Electronic Intellectual Property, Suite 308, The Foundry, 156 Blackfriars Road London SE1 8EN / GB | ||
Former [2003/51] | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al Electronic Intellectual Property, Suite 308, The Foundry, 156 Blackfriars Road London SE1 8EN / GB | ||
Former [2001/08] | Spaargaren, Jerome R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99920963.8 | 04.05.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999GB01383 | Priority number, date | GB19980009976 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: GB 9809976 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9959312 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1076981 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076981 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04M1/72 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
H04N7/148 (EP,US);
H04M1/0214 (EP,US);
H04M1/0216 (EP,US);
H04M1/0247 (EP,US);
H04M1/03 (EP,US);
H04N7/142 (EP,US);
H04N7/144 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04M2250/52 (EP,US);
H04N2007/145 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | Mobiltelefon mit Kamera | [2004/17] | English: | Mobile telephone with camera | [2004/17] | French: | Téléphone mobil avec caméra | [2004/17] |
Former [2001/08] | MOBILES FERNMELDEWESSEN | ||
Former [2001/08] | MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS | ||
Former [2001/08] | COMMUNICATION MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02076464.3 / EP1241860 | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2004 | BE | 15.12.2004 | CH | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | LI | 15.12.2004 | NL | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | CY | 04.05.2005 | IE | 04.05.2005 | LU | 04.05.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/31] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
LU | 04.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
LU | 04.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH1065780 ; | [A]US4525746 (MANGOLD HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 1, line 48 - line 68; figures 1,2A,2B,3,4A, * * column 4, line 7 - line 13; figures 1,2A,2B,3,4A, * * column 4, line 7 - line 13; figures 2,6,7 *; | [A]US5177784 (HU ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 46 - line 54; figures 2,6,7 * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 39; figures 2,6,7 * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 39; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US5491507 (UMEZAWA KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 3,5,6,8,13,14,16-18 * column 1, line 36 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-3 * * column 5, line 29 - line 62; figures 1-3 * * column 7, line 40 - line 59; figures 1-3 * * column 12, line 16 - column 13, line 36; figures 1-3 * * column 13, line 57 - column 14, line 61; figures 1-3 * * column 18, line 37 - column 20, line 11; figures 1-3 * * column 18, line 37 - column 20, line 11; figures 7,9,11,12,17 * [A] 4,7,15,19,20; | [A]GB2295744 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 3-6 * abstract ** abstract *; | [XA]US5550754 (MCNELLEY STEVE [US], et al) [X] 8-11,13,14,16,17 * column 6, line 35 - column 9, line 50; figures 7,9,11,12,17 * * column 16, line 17 - column 18, line 27; figures 7,9,11,12,17 * * column 16, line 17 - column 18, line 27; figures 6-10,21-23,26 * [A] 12,15,19; | [XA]DE19528424 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 12,14 * column 1, line 29 - line 67; figures 6-10,21-23,26 * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 6; figures 6-10,21-23,26 * * column 5, line 25 - line 28; figures 6-10,21-23,26 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 5; figures 6-10,21-23,26 * * column 6, line 36 - line 66; figures 6-10,21-23,26 * * column 7, line 17 - column 9, line 17; figures 6-10,21-23,26 * * column 7, line 17 - column 9, line 17; figures 2,3 * [A] 8,16,19; | [A]WO9726744 (ROBB GARRY DOUGLAS [CA]) [A] 8,12,13,20 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 26; figures 2,3 * * page 2, line 15 - line 20; figures 2,3 * * page 5, line 7 - line 15; figures 2,3 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 17; figures 2,3 * * page 9, line 8 - line 27; figures 2,3 * * page 13, line 11 - line 25; figures 2,3 * * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 9; figures 2,3 * * page 18, line 9 - line 28; figures 2,3 * * page 18, line 9 - line 28; figures 1,5 *; | [XA]FR2746997 (PRALUS CHARLES [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 24; figures 1,9,10 * * page 4, line 19 - line 31; figures 1,9,10 * * page 4, line 19 - line 31; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 13; | [X]WO9743852 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * page 16, line 15 - page 18, line 1 * * page 22, line 1 - page 23, line 2 * * page 42, line 4 - line 18 * * page 42, line 4 - line 18; figures 1,9,10 *; | [E]WO9927433 (GATEWAY 2000 INC [US]) [E] 1 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 19; figures 1,2,4 * * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 15; figures 1,2,4 * * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 15; figures 1,2A,2B,3,4A, * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10065780 A 19980306 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 8,12-14 * abstract * [A] 16 |