EP1181409 - INKJET TRANSFER SYSTEMS FOR DARK TEXTILE SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKWRIGHT Incorporated 538 Main Street, P.O. Box 139 Fiskeville Rhode Island 02823-0139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states ARKWRIGHT Incorporated 538 Main Street, P.O. Box 139 Fiskeville, Rhode Island 02823-0139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAMBERG, Ulf Kastanienweg 8 D-79798 Jestetten / DE | 02 /
KUMMER, Peter Schaffhauserstrasse 19 CH-8213 Neunkirch / CH | 03 /
STIBUREK, Ilona Köchlistrasse 6 CH-8004 Zürich / CH | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99921049.5 | 01.06.1999 | [2002/09] | WO1999IB00976 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073570 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181409 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181409 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D06Q1/12, B41M5/035, B44C1/17 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
B41M5/0256 (EP,US);
B41J2/0057 (US);
B41M5/502 (US);
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B44C1/1716 (EP,US);
D06P5/003 (EP,US);
D06P5/007 (EP,US);
D06P5/30 (EP,US);
D06Q1/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2002/09] | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHL-TRANSFERSYSTEME FÜR DUNKLE TEXTILSUBSTRATE | [2002/09] | English: | INKJET TRANSFER SYSTEMS FOR DARK TEXTILE SUBSTRATES | [2002/09] | French: | SYSTEMES DE TRANSFERT PAR JET D'ENCRE POUR SUBSTRATS TEXTILES FONCES | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 02.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5242739 (KRONZER FRANCES J [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 29 * * column 4, line 55 - line 64 ** example 1; claims 1,6,9 *; | [AD]US5501902 (KRONZER FRANCIS J [US]) [AD] 1-16 * claims 1,13,14,18,27-30 * * figure 2; examples 1-6 * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 18 * * column 3, line 58 - line 67 *; | [AD]WO9830749 (MESSERLI AG A [CH], et al) [AD] 1-16 * examples 1,2; claims 1,6,11,17 * * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 23 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 7 * |