EP1079399 - UNIFORM MAGNETIC FORCE GENERATING MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | For all designated states JAPAN as represented by National Research Institute for Metals 2-1, Sengen 1-chome, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0041 / JP | For all designated states JAPAN as Represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN as represented by National Research Institute for Metals 2-1, Sengen 1-chome, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0041 / JP | |||
For all designated states JAPAN as Represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | |||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN as represented by National Research Institute for Metals 2-1, Sengen 1-chome, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0041 / JP | |||
For all designated states JAPAN as Represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIYOSHI, Tsukasa National Res. Inst. for Metals 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0041 / JP | 02 /
WADA, Hitoshi National Res. Inst. for Metals 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0041 / JP | 03 /
WAKAYAMA, Nobuko National Inst. Mat.& Chem. Res. 1-1, Higashi Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8565 / JP | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2011/26] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2001/09] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99921173.3 | 19.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999JP02607 | Priority number, date | JP19980137220 | 19.05.1998 Original published format: JP 13722098 | [2001/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960584 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079399 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/20, G01R33/3875 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H01F7/0278 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/09] | H01F7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/09] | Title | German: | MAGNET ZUR ERZEUGUNG HOMOGENES MAGNETFELDS | [2001/09] | English: | UNIFORM MAGNETIC FORCE GENERATING MAGNET | [2001/09] | French: | AIMANT PRODUISANT UNE FORCE MAGNETIQUE UNIFORME | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2000 | Translation filed | 24.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 31.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4683434 (TSCHOPP WERNER [CH]) [X] 1-5 * column 5, lines 18-21; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US4716370 (INOUE YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 1; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH0845729 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS); | [Y]JPS61200452 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |