EP1010983 - PROBE WITH OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | [2008/09] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8-, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKASA, Koichi 1-1-901, Nishi 5-chome Minami 13-jou Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 064-0913 / JP | 02 /
SUEOKA, Kazuhisa Ropia Higashi-asabu 108 3-10, Higashi 3-chome Kita 35-jou Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 007-0053 / JP | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99921195.6 | 20.05.1999 | [2000/25] | WO1999JP02643 | Priority number, date | JP19980178263 | 25.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17826398 | [2000/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9967648 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010983 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1010983 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00, G01N37/00, G01B11/30, G12B1/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G01Q60/16 (EP,US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
G02B6/241 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | G01N37/00, G01B11/30, G12B1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/25] | Title | German: | SONDE MIT OPTISCHEM WELLENLEITER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/42] | English: | PROBE WITH OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/25] | French: | SONDE A GUIDE D'ONDES OPTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2000/25] |
Former [2000/25] | SONDE MIT OPTISCHEN WELLENLEITER UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2000 | Translation filed | 17.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5394741 (KAJIMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 15; figure 10 * * column 5, line 24 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0355241 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 18 - line 27 * * column 5, line 24 - line 29 * | International search | [A]JPH06289035 (THERMOVONICS CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH1093192 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AP]JPH10293134 (CANON KK) | Examination | EP0860726 |