EP1081492 - PACKING MATERIAL FOR CHROMATOGRAPHY HAVING NOVEL CHARACTERISTIC AND METHOD FOR ISOLATION OF SUBSTANCE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellseed Inc. Shinjuku Fukuchi Bldg. 1F 6-29-8 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | [2009/03] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states CellSeed Inc. Shinjuku Fukuchi Bldg. 1F 6-29-8 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | ||
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Cellseed Inc. Shinjuku Fukuchi Bldg. 1F 6-29-8 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Okano, Teruo, Prof. 6-12-12, Kounodai Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0827 / JP | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Amersham Pharmacia Biotech K.K. Sanken Building, 25-1, Hyakunin-cho 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 169-0073 / JP | ||
For all designated states Okano, Teruo 6-12-12, Kounodai Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0827 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKANO, Teruo 6-12-12, Kounodai Ichikawa-shi Chiba 272-0827 / JP | 02 /
KIKUCHI, Akihiko 3-26-1-401, Hyakunin-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 169-0073 / JP | 03 /
SAKURAI, Yasuhisa 3-17-6, Eifuku Suginami-ku Tokyo 168-0064 / JP | 04 /
KANAZAWA, Hideko 2896-1-303, Kamitsuruma Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 228-0802 / JP | 05 /
MATSUSHIMA, Yoshikazu 2-3-21, Ikeda Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0022 / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/07] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/10] | Rollins, Anthony John, et al Group Patents, Nycomed Amersham plc, Amersham Laboratories, White Lion Road Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99921232.7 | 24.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999JP02698 | Priority number, date | JP19980140722 | 22.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14072298 | [2001/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9961904 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081492 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081492 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/285, G01N30/54, B01J20/26 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B01J20/285 (EP,US);
B01D15/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/287 (EP,US);
B01J20/327 (EP,US);
B01J39/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D15/20, G01N30/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/30] | G01N30/48, G01N30/54, B01J20/32 | ||
Former IPC [2001/10] | G01N30/48, G01N30/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | FÜLLKÖRPERMATERIAL FÜR CHROMATOGRAPHIE MIT NEUEN CHARAKTERISTIKA UND VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON SUBSTANZEN UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN | [2001/10] | English: | PACKING MATERIAL FOR CHROMATOGRAPHY HAVING NOVEL CHARACTERISTIC AND METHOD FOR ISOLATION OF SUBSTANCE USING THE SAME | [2001/10] | French: | REMPLISSAGE POUR CHROMATOGRAPHIE AYANT UNE NOUVELLE CARACTERISTIQUE ET PROCEDE D'ISOLATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE UTILISANT LEDIT REMPLISSAGE | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2000 | Translation filed | 22.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2009 | CY | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | IE | 24.05.2009 | LU | 24.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | [2017/13] |
Former [2011/45] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
CY | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 24.05.2009 | ||
LU | 24.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 24.05.2009 | ||
LU | 24.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
IE | 24.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0534016 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 6, line 3 - line 19 * * column 6, line 35 - line 36; claims 1-19 *; | [PX]WO9833064 (PHARMACIA BIOTECH K K [JP], et al) [PX] 1-14 * abstract *; | EP0955542 [ ] (AMERSHAM PHARMACIA BIOTECH K K [JP]) [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH06262071 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [X]JPH075161 (HIRAYAMA CHUICHI, et al); | [X]JPH07318551 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP); | [X]JPH08103653 (TERUMO CORP); | [X]JPH0949830 (TERUMO CORP); | [X] - HIDEKO KANAZAWA, ET AL., "TEMPERATURE-RESPONSIVE LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY 2. EFFECTS OF HYDROPHOBIC GROUPS IN N-ISOPROPYLACRYLAMIDE COPOLYMER-MODIFIED SILICA", Analytical Chemistry, American Chemical Society, (19970301), vol. 69, no. 05, doi:10.1021/ac961024k, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 823 - 830, XP002922237 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac961024k | [X] - HIDEKO KANAZAWA, ET AL., "TEMPERATURE-RESPONSIVE CHROMATOGRAPHY USING POLY(N-ISOPROPYLACRYLAMIDE)-MODIFIED SILICA", Analytical Chemistry, American Chemical Society, (19960101), vol. 68, no. 01, doi:10.1021/ac950359j, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 100 - 105, XP002922238 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac950359j | [A] - IVANOV A E, ET AL., "EFFECT OF TEMPERATURE UPON THE CHROMATOGRAPHY OF PROTEINS ON POROUSGLASS CHEMICALLY COATED WITH N-ISOPROPYLACRYLAMIDE COPOLYMER", Journal of Chromatography, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., NL, NL, (19970101), vol. 776, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(97)00441-X, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 75 - 80, XP002922239 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(97)00441-X |