EP1242717 - MANHOLE LINER INCLUDING FELT IMPREGNATED VINYL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-Triplex Technologies, Inc. 9851 Thomas Drive, Suite 108 Panama City, Florida 32408 / US | [2005/13] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states McNeil, Ronald A. 13 Norriega Road Destin, FL 32541 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ronald, A. McNeil 13 Norriega Road Destin, FL 32541 / US | [2005/13] |
Former [2002/39] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 99921634.4 | 05.05.1999 | [2002/39] | WO1999US09697 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068543 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242717 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242717 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/00, E02D29/12 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
E02D29/124 (EP,US);
E02D29/12 (EP,US);
E02D29/125 (EP,US);
E02D29/128 (EP,US);
F16L55/1656 (EP,US);
E02D2300/007 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/39] | E21D11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2005/17] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | MIT VINYLHARZEN IMPRÄGNIERTES FILZ ENTHALTENDES FUTTER FÜR EIN MANNLOCH | [2004/49] | English: | MANHOLE LINER INCLUDING FELT IMPREGNATED VINYL | [2002/39] | French: | DOUBLURE D'ALESAGES COMPORTANT DU FEUTRE IMPREGNE DE RESINE VINYLIQUE | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/39] | Mit Vinylharzen imprägniertes Filz enthaltendes Futter für ein Mannloch | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 01.07.2002 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 08.08.2002 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 27.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 26.03.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE | 24.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 | 31.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 | 31.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 | 31.01.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 | 31.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 | 31.01.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 | 31.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 | 31.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.01.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 05.12.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0403133 (OZITE CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 30 - column 11, line 29; figures 1,4,7-9 *; | [A]US5490744 (MCNEIL RONALD A [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]US4366012 (WOOD ERIC) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [XE]US5915886 (MCNEIL RONALD A [US]); | [A]US4009063 (WOOD ERIC [GB]); | [A]US4135958 (WOOD ERIC); | [A]US4434115 (CHICK DOUGLAS K [GB]); | [A]US4861634 (RENAUD ALAIN S [FR]); | [A]US5106440 (TANGEMAN ANDREW F [US]); | [A]US5265981 (MCNEIL RONALD A [US]); | [A]US5280811 (CATALLO GUILIO [US], et al); | [A]US5490744 (MCNEIL RONALD A [US]); | [A]US5501248 (KIEST JR LARRY W [US]); | [A]US5651848 (COHEE DONALD R [US], et al); | [A]US5672398 (JOHNSON ALEXANDER CHARLES EDWA [GB]); | [A]US5874151 (COHEE DONALD R [US], et al) |