EP1083794 - Concentrated aqueous bromine solutions and their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/12] | CONCENTRATED AQUEOUS BROMINE SOLUTIONS AND THEIR PREPARATION | ||
[2002/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Robert, M., Jr. 6152 Belle Grove Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US | 02 /
NALEPA, Christopher, J. 4142 Country Hill Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99921675.7 | 03.05.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999US09801 | Priority number, date | US19980088300 | 01.06.1998 Original published format: US 88300 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962339 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083794 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083794 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/00, A01N25/22, C02F1/76 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A01N59/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/766 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N59/02, A01N25/22 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/12] | Title | German: | Konzentrierte wässrige Bromlösungen und ihre Herstellung | [2002/32] | English: | Concentrated aqueous bromine solutions and their preparation | [2002/32] | French: | Solutions bromées aqueuses et concentrées et leur préparation | [2002/32] |
Former [2001/12] | KONZENTRIERTE WÄSSRIGE BROMLÖSUNGEN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2001/12] | CONCENTRATED AQUEOUS BROMINE SOLUTIONS AND THEIR PREPARATION | ||
Former [2001/12] | SOLUTIONS BROMEES AQUEUSES ET CONCENTREES ET LEUR PREPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 26.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ADX]US3558503 (GOODENOUGH ROBERT D, et al) [AD] 1-35 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 28 - line 51 * * column 2, line 55 - line 64 * * column 4, line 66 - line 76; claim - * [X] 26-35; | [AX]WO9734827 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-35 * page 1 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph L - page 7, line 11; example 1; claim - * [X] 26-31; | [D]US5683654 (DALLMIER ANTHONY W [US], et al); | [AD]US5141652 (MOORE JR ROBERT M [US], et al) [AD] 1-35 * column 1 - column 2, line 31 *; | [A]US3152073 (MORTON JOHN R) [A] 20-25 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 55 * * column 4, line 74 - column 5, line 21; claims 4,5 * * table II * |