EP1079893 - CARDIAC PACING USING ADJUSTABLE ATRIO-VENTRICULAR DELAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARDIAC PACEMAKERS, INC. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, Minnesota 55112-5798 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states CARDIAC PACEMAKERS, INC. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, Minnesota 55112-5798 / US | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states CARDIAC PACEMAKERS, INC. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, Minnesota 55112-5798 / US | ||
For all designated states Ding, Jiang 1237 Countryview Circle Maplewood, Minnesota 55109 / US | |||
For all designated states Yu, Yinghong 2926 Walter Street Maplewood, MN 55109 / US | |||
For all designated states Kramer, Andrew P. 418 South Sixth Street Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | |||
For all designated states Spinelli, Julio 5612 Chatsworth Street Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Jiang 1237 Countryview Circle Maplewood, MN 55109 / US | 02 /
YU, Yinghong 2926 Walter Street Maplewood, MN 55109 / US | 03 /
KRAMER, Andrew, P. 418 South Sixth Street Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | 04 /
SPINELLI, Julio 5612 Chatsworth Street Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2001/10] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99921811.8 | 07.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US10142 | Priority number, date | US19980084704P | 08.05.1998 Original published format: US 84704 P | US19980075278 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: US 75278 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958191 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079893 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1079893 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/368 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A61N1/3627 (EP);
A61N1/3682 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [2001/10] | Title | German: | HERZREIZUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON EINSTELLBAREN ATRIO-VENTRIKULÄREN VERZÖGERUNGSINTERVALLEN | [2001/10] | English: | CARDIAC PACING USING ADJUSTABLE ATRIO-VENTRICULAR DELAYS | [2001/10] | French: | STIMULATION CARDIAQUE UTILISANT DES RETARDS AURICULO-VENTRICULAIRES REGLABLES | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | BE | 03.08.2005 | CH | 03.08.2005 | FR | 03.08.2005 | LI | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0474958 (FEREK PETRIC BOZIDAR [YU], et al) [A] 1,27* column A; figure - *; | [A]US5318595 (FEREK-PETRIC BOZIDAR [YU], et al) [A] 1,27 * column W *; | [A]US5334222 (SALO RODNEY W [US], et al) [A] 1,18,25 * column W *; | [A]US5554177 (KIEVAL ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1,24,26 * abstract *; | [XA]US5690689 (SHOLDER JASON A [US]) [X] 1,11,12,15 * abstract * * column 5, line 39 - line 50 * * column 17, line 43 - column 18, line 13 * * figure -; claim 19 * [A] 13,14,16,17; | [A]US5700283 (SALO RODNEY W [US]) [A] 1,18,25 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 8 * * figure - * | by applicant | US5906237 |