EP1082777 - WIDEBAND RF PORT STRUCTURE USING COPLANAR WAVEGUIDE AND BGA I/O [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsubstrates Corporation 2400 South Roosevelt Street Tempe, AZ 85282 / US | [2001/24] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states CIRCUIT COMPONENTS INC. 2400 South Roosevelt Street Tempe, Arizona 85282 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOURIET, Daniel, F. 4918 Smallwood Court Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99921919.9 | 13.05.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999US10437 | Priority number, date | US19980084564 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: US 84564 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962135 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082777 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/00, H05K1/02, H01L23/66, H01P1/04 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01L23/49805 (EP,US);
H01P1/047 (EP,US);
H01P3/003 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6616 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6627 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/854 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01057 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01067 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1423 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15173 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15174 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1903 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30111 (EP,US);
H05K1/0245 (EP,US);
H05K1/025 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/854, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45014, H01L2924/206 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/30111, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) (-) |
Former IPC [2001/11] | H01P5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | BREITBANDIGE RF-TORSTRUKTUR MIT KAPLANARWELLENLEITER UND BGA-EIN/AUSGANG | [2001/11] | English: | WIDEBAND RF PORT STRUCTURE USING COPLANAR WAVEGUIDE AND BGA I/O | [2001/11] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PORT HF A LARGE BANDE COMPRENANT UN GUIDE D'ONDES COPLANAIRE ET UNE E/S DE TYPE BGA | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 03.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 27.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0396152 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 45 * * figures 1-7 ** abstract *; | [Y]US5294897 (NOTANI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * column 7, line 66 - column 10, line 43 * * figures 1A-4B * * abstract *; | [Y] - PANICKER M P R ET AL, "BALL GRID ARRAYS: A DC TO 31.5 GHZ LOW COST PACKAGING SOLUTION FOR MICROWAVE AND MM-WAVE MMICS", MICROWAVE JOURNAL, HORIZON HOUSE. DEDHAM, US, (1998), vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0192-6225, page 158,160,162,16, XP000768652 [Y] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH03262302 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]US5424693 (LIN CHAO-HUI [TW]); | [X] - PANICKER M. P. R., ET AL., "BALL GRID ARRAYS: A DC TO 31.5 GHZ LOW COST PACKAGING SOLUTION FOR MICROWAVE AND MM-WAVE MMICS.", MICROWAVE JOURNAL., HORIZON HOUSE PUBLICATIONS, NORWOOD, MA., US, US, (19980101), vol. 41., no. 01., ISSN 0192-6225, page 158 + 160 + 162 + 16, XP000768652 |