EP1077794 - BRIEFCASE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swiss Army Brands, Inc. One Research Drive, P.O. Box 874 Shelton, CT 06484-0874 / US | [2001/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGGART, John, Merrick 3 Ayrshire Court Cromwell, CT 06416 / US | 02 /
TURNER, Jeffrey, A. 39 Madison Avenue Madison, CT 06443 / US | 03 /
RICHARDSON, Edward, S. Churchill Lane Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 04 /
NELSEN, Daniel, J. 3rd floor,62 Camp Street Providence, RI 02906 / US | 05 /
LANE, Stephen, E. 5 Middle Street Jamestown, RI 02835 / US | 06 /
HARRISON, Marc 568 Bristol Ferry Road Portsmouth, RI 02971 / US | 07 /
SMITH, Daniel, P. 1291 Narragansee Boulevard Cranston, RI 02909 / US | 08 /
PEREIRA, Michael, C. 28 Yates Street Lincoln, RI 02865 / US | 09 /
PETRIE, Aidan, J. 77 Parade Street Providence, RI 02906 / US | [2001/16] |
Former [2001/09] | 01 /
TAGGART, John, Merrick 3 Ayrshire Court Cromwell, CT 06416 / US | ||
02 /
TURNER, Jeffrey, A. 39 Madison Avenue Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
03 /
RICHARDSON, Edward, S. 1172 Unquowa Road Fairfield, CT 06430 / US | |||
04 /
NELSEN, Daniel, J. 3rd floor,62 Camp Street Providence, RI 02906 / US | |||
05 /
LANE, Stephen, E. 5 Middle Street Jamestown, RI 02835 / US | |||
06 /
HARRISON, Marc 568 Bristol Ferry Road Portsmouth, RI 02971 / US | |||
07 /
SMITH, Daniel, P. 1291 Narragansett Boulevard Cranston, RI 02909 / US | |||
08 /
PEREIRA, Michael, C. 28 Yates Street Lincoln, RI 02865 / US | |||
09 /
PETRIE, Aidan, J. 77 Parade Street Providence, RI 02906 / US | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Moreland, David, Dr., et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99921924.9 | 12.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US10511 | Priority number, date | US19980085213P | 12.05.1998 Original published format: US 85213 P | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958303 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077794 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B26B11/00, F21V33/00 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A45C15/00 (KR);
B25F1/003 (EP);
B26B11/008 (EP);
F21L2/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2001/09] | Title | German: | INSTRUMENT DAS IN EINEM DOKUMENTENHALTER EINGEBRACHT WERDEN KANN | [2001/09] | English: | BRIEFCASE TOOL | [2001/09] | French: | INSTRUMENT POUVANT SE RANGER DANS UN PORTE-DOCUMENTS | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 24.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5653525 (PARK KYUNGHAN [KR]) [Y] 1,4,7,8,10-12 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 53; figures 9,10 * [A] 5; | [Y]US5318177 (ISACSON BRUCE P [US]) [Y] 1,7,8,10,11 * column 9, line 5 - line 39; figure 7 *; | [A]CH686173 (WENGER SA [CH]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 2; figure 2 *; | [A]US4843526 (PRICE III GEORGE T [US]) [A] 2,3,5 * column 1, line 39 - line 55; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0247974 (MONTANA COLTELLERIA SPA [IT]) [Y] 4,12 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US5459647 (BETTS DAVID [GB]); | [Y]US4794692 (WANG REID [TW]); | [X]US5653525 (PARK KYUNGHAN [KR]); | [Y]US5318177 (ISACSON BRUCE P [US]); | [Y]USD388713S (YUEN SE KIT [HK]); | [Y]US5689886 (YEH SHIH-YUAN [TW]) | by applicant | US4238862 | US4854045 | US5313376 |