EP1095327 - LOW POWER, HIGH SPEED COMMUNICATIONS BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gigabus, Inc. 1917 Ocaso Camino Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERMAN, David, L. 1917 Ocaso Camino Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99921975.1 | 14.05.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999US10792 | Priority number, date | US19980080671 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: US 80671 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960463 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095327 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/12 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G06F13/4217 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGSTROM, HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-KOMMUNIKATIONSBUS | [2001/18] | English: | LOW POWER, HIGH SPEED COMMUNICATIONS BUS | [2001/18] | French: | BUS DE COMMUNICATION A VITESSE ELEVEE, A FAIBLE PUISSANCE | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 02.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/25] | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2003 | 31.05.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4511993 (BROMME IRMFRIED [DE], et al); | [Y]US5034967 (COX WILLIAM M [US], et al); | [X]US5392422 (HOEL JEFFREY H [US], et al); | [Y]US5469547 (PAWLOWSKI CHESTER W [US]); | [YP]US5870441 (COTTON JOHN M [US], et al); | [Y] - KIM S. ET AL, "Hierarchical Synchronization Scheme Using Self-Timed Mesochronous Interconnections", IEEE, (19970609), pages 1824 - 1827, XP000802929 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1997.621501 |