EP1066105 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING CONTAMINANTS IN EXHAUST GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUFERT, Ronald Alfred-Schefczik-Strasse 3 D-96247 Michelau / DE | [2001/02] | Application number, filing date | 99922043.7 | 18.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999DE00769 | Priority number, date | DE1998113723 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19813723 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949958 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066105 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066105 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, F01N3/20, F01N3/02 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
B01D53/94 (KR);
B01D53/9431 (EP,US);
F01N3/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/9459 (EP,US);
F01N2240/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | ABGASSYSTEM EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION VON SCHADSTOFFEN IN EINEM ABGAS | [2001/02] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING CONTAMINANTS IN EXHAUST GASES | [2001/02] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DES POLLUANTS CONTENUS DANS LES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 22.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 05.03.2003 | FR | 05.03.2003 | GB | 05.03.2003 | IT | 05.03.2003 | NL | 05.03.2003 | AT | 18.03.2003 | CH | 31.03.2003 | LI | 31.03.2003 | DK | 05.06.2003 | SE | 05.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | DE | 01.10.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/35] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
FR | 05.03.2003 | ||
GB | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
AT | 18.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
DE | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GB | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
AT | 18.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
DE | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GB | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
DE | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GB | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
NL | 05.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0857258 ; | [A]JPH0515739 ; | [A]JPH01143631 ; | [DA]DE3002871 (BRUNN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,12 * figure -; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US5121602 (MCCORVEY ALLAN F [US]) [A] 1,5-7,12 * abstract *; | [A]US5189878 (ROBINSON ANTONIO [US], et al) [A] 1,7,9,11,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 096, no. 007, & JP08057258 A 19960305 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] 1,2,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930602), vol. 017, no. 285, Database accession no. (C - 1066), & JP05015739 A 19930126 (SEKIYU SANGIYOU KATSUSEIKA SENTAA;OTHERS: 02) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890905), vol. 013, no. 399, Database accession no. (C - 632), & JP01143631 A 19890606 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | DE3002871 | EP0577853 |