EP1114880 - STEEL SHEET FOR HEAT SHRINK BAND WITH SLIGHT COLOR MISREGISTERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGAMI, Nobuo, NKK Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 02 /
TOMITA, Kunikazu, NKK Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 03 /
TAKADA, Yasuyuki, NKK Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 04 /
ODA, Yoshihiko, NKK Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 05 /
SATO, Chohachi, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 06 /
TAKEUCHI, Teruo, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 07 /
SAITO, Ichiro, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 08 /
KATO, Hiroaki, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/28] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99922569.1 | 28.05.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999JP02856 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073526 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1114880 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/06, C22C38/02, H01J29/87 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/004 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR);
H01F1/14775 (EP);
H01J29/87 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP);
C21D8/0236 (EP);
C21D8/0273 (EP);
C21D8/12 (EP);
H01J2229/003 (EP);
H01J2229/875 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/28] | C22C38/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2001/28] | Title | German: | STAHLBLECH FÜR WÄRMESCHRUMPFFÄHIGES BAND MIT GERINGEN FARBFEHLERN | [2001/28] | English: | STEEL SHEET FOR HEAT SHRINK BAND WITH SLIGHT COLOR MISREGISTERING | [2001/28] | French: | TOLE D'ACIER POUR BANDE THERMORETRACTABLE AVEC LEGER DEFAUT DE RACCORD EN IMPRESSION | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2001 | Translation filed | 26.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2322575 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 25 - page 26; figure 6; claim 3 *; | [X]EP0852265 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 53 - line 56; claim 1; tables 1,3 * * page 6, line 23 - line 26 *; | [X]JPS62185828 ; | [X]US5019191 (OGATA RYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 10; figures 2,3 * * column 7, line 3 - line 5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880204), vol. 012, no. 037, Database accession no. (C - 473), & JP62185828 A 19870814 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH10214578 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH0387313 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [X]JPH086134B ; | [XE]JPH11209848 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al) |