EP1025885 - RECORDED MEDIUM AND ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Incorporated 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATSUKA, Susumu Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
SHIMOOKA, Kenkichi Sony Computer Entertainment Inc 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Yuji Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99922603.8 | 31.05.1999 | [2000/32] | WO1999JP02895 | Priority number, date | JP19980151528 | 01.06.1998 Original published format: JP 15152898 | [2000/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962605 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025885 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/00 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/033 (EP,US);
A63F13/42 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/24 (KR,US);
A63F13/245 (EP,KR);
A63F13/57 (EP,KR);
A63F13/95 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1006 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1043 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/206 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/6045 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/64 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/807 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND UNTERHALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/32] | English: | RECORDED MEDIUM AND ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEM | [2000/32] | French: | SUPPORT ENREGISTRE ET SYSTEME RECREATIF | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2000 | Translation filed | 01.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 23.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5704837 (IWASAKI GORO [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 10, line 23 - line 33 * * column 11, line 28 - line 63 * * figure 8 *; | [X]WO9815328 (NAMCO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [PX]US6340330 (OISHI MASUYA [JP], et al) [PX] 1-6* column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 31 * | International search | [Y]JPH04156875 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK); | [X]JPH0924161 (NAMCO LTD); | [X]JPH0950539 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK) | [X] - SHINSEISHA K.K., "The Best Game 2", GAMEST MOOK, (19980117), vol. 112, page 93 | by applicant | JPH0788252 | US5704837 |