EP1103834 - ZOOM LENS AND VIDEO CAMERA COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Katsu 10-8, Nishiotsuka 1-chome Matsubara-shi, Osaka 580-0011 / JP | 02 /
ONO, Shusuke 31-11, Fukazawahonmachi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0033 / JP | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/22] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99922617.8 | 31.05.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999JP02910 | Priority number, date | JP19980151361 | 01.06.1998 Original published format: JP 15136198 | JP19980302109 | 23.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30210998 | JP19990108482 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10848299 | [2001/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963380 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103834 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/16, G02B13/18, G02B15/173, G02B27/64 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G02B27/646 (EP);
G02B15/144113 (EP,US);
G02B15/145121 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | G02B15/16, G02B13/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/22] | Title | German: | ZOOM-OBJEKTIV UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN EINER VIDEOKAMERA | [2001/22] | English: | ZOOM LENS AND VIDEO CAMERA COMPRISING THE SAME | [2001/22] | French: | OBJECTIF A DISTANCE FOCALE VARIABLE ET CAMERA VIDEO LE COMPORTANT | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2000 | Translation filed | 15.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP05026492.8 / EP1666946 | EP05026493.6 / EP1650594 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH07199124 (NIKON CORP); | [Y]JPH09281393 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]JPH09288236 (COPAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH07128619 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH09281391 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH06265827 (NIKON CORP) |