EP1076893 - TRANSCRIPTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Virtual Ink Corporation Suite 306, 56 Roland Street Boston, MA 02139 / US | [2001/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERY, Yonald 305 Memorial Drive 503C Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
KELLEY, Andrew, III 305 Memorial Drive 607C Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
MOYNE, William, P. 305 Memorial Drive 603C Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
VERMINSKI, Matthew, D. 33 Cogswell Avenue 5 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 05 /
PEREZ, Manuel 7 Worchester Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99922810.9 | 05.05.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999US09879 | Priority number, date | US19980079430 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: US 79430 | US19980090744P | 26.06.1998 Original published format: US 90744 P | US19980109361P | 20.11.1998 Original published format: US 109361 P | US19990273883 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 273883 | US19990274139 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 274139 | US19990274136 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 274136 | US19990274267 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 274267 | US19990273593 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 273593 | US19990274137 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 274137 | US19990273887 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 273887 | US19990273921 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 273921 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959130 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076893 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
G06F3/0418 (EP,US);
G06F3/03545 (EP);
G06F3/043 (EP);
G06F3/0433 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/08] | G09G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | TRANSSKRIPTIONSSYSTEM | [2001/08] | English: | TRANSCRIPTION SYSTEM | [2001/08] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSCRIPTION | [2001/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/33] | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4688933 (LAPEYRE JAMES M [US]) [X] 1-6,9-21 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 54; figures 1,2,6,10 *; | [A]US4814552 (STEFIK MARK J [US], et al) [A] 1,9,14,16-21 * abstract * * column 3, line 22 - line 57; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US5298737 (PROPER R J [NL]); | [Y]US4688933 (LAPEYRE JAMES M [US]); | [Y]US5576727 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al); | [Y]US5107541 (HILTON COLIN S [GB]); | [Y]US5420607 (MILLER ROBERT F [US], et al); | [Y]US5583323 (ZURSTADT DONALD H [US], et al); | [Y]US4777329 (MALLICOAT SAMUEL W [US]) |