EP1098564 - WATER-FREE CONCENTRATE OF AMITRAZ INSECTICIDE AND CLEAR POUR-ON FORMULATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISP INVESTMENTS INC. 818 Washington Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states ISP INVESTMENTS INC. 818 Washington Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARAYANAN, Kolazi, S. 33 Carol Place Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | 02 /
JON, Domingo Apartment 28, 41-51 Kenmare Street New York, NY 10012 / US | 03 /
PRETTYPAUL, Donald 123 Van Nostrand Avenue Englewood, NJ 07631 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99922835.6 | 07.05.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999US09981 | Priority number, date | US19980121072 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: US 121072 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0004771 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098564 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/00, A01N37/52 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
A01N37/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/52, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/52, A01N25/02 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2001/20] | A01N25/00, A01N33/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | WASSERFREIES KONZENTRAT DES INSEKTIZIDS AMITRAZ UND KLARE POUR-ON-FORMULIERUNGEN DAVON | [2001/20] | English: | WATER-FREE CONCENTRATE OF AMITRAZ INSECTICIDE AND CLEAR POUR-ON FORMULATIONS THEREOF | [2001/20] | French: | CONCENTRE ANHYDRE D'INSECTICIDE AMITRAZ ET FORMULATIONS LIMPIDES POUR APPLICATIONS TRANSCUTANEES | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/17] | 24.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US5354726 (NARAYANAN KOLAZI S [US], et al); | [Y]US4438137 (ALLAN KEITH [GB]); | [Y]US5130135 (VAN TONDER STEPHANUS J [ZA]) |