EP1004119 - A DYNAMIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY SYSTEM WITH SIMULTANEOUS ACCESS AND REFRESH OPERATIONS AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Aquarius Incorporated Suite 300, 801 E. Campbell Road Richardson, TX 75081 / US | [2000/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLAND, Wayland, Bart Apartment 241, 2808 McKinney Dallas, TX 75204 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99923158.2 | 17.05.1999 | [2000/22] | WO1999US10892 | Priority number, date | US19980080813 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: US 80813 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960573 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1004119 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00, G11C11/406, G11C11/405 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
G11C11/406 (EP,US);
G11C7/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2000/22] | G11C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES DIREKTZUGRIFFSPEICHERSYSTEM MIT GLEICHZEITIGEM ZUGRIFF SOWIE AUFFRISCHUNGSBETRIEB UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [2000/22] | English: | A DYNAMIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY SYSTEM WITH SIMULTANEOUS ACCESS AND REFRESH OPERATIONS AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME | [2000/22] | French: | SYSTEME A MEMOIRE DRAM A OPERATIONS SIMULTANEES D'ACCES ET DE REGENERATION, ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2000/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/26] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4203159 (WANLASS FRANK M [US]) [X] 1-18* figures 1,4 * | International search | [X] - SAKURAI ET AL, "Transparent-Refresh DRAM (TReD) Using Dual-Port DRAM Cell", IEEE CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, (1988), pages 4.3.1 - 4.3.4, XP000014120 |