EP1076763 - AN AIR-FUEL MODULE ADAPTED FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sturman Industries, Inc. One Innovation Way Woodland Park, CO 80863 / US | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Sturman Industries One Innovation Way Woodland Park, CO 80863 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sturman, Oded E One Innovation Way Woodland Park, CO 80863 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99923222.6 | 13.05.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999US11065 | Priority number, date | US19980078881 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: US 78881 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958822 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076763 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/02 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
F02M47/043 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F01L9/10 (EP,US);
F02M57/025 (EP,US);
F02M59/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | LUFT-BRENNSTOFF MODULE FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2001/08] | English: | AN AIR-FUEL MODULE ADAPTED FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2001/08] | French: | MODULE AIR-CARBURANT ADAPTE A UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2001/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 09.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/13] | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4009695 (ULE LOUIS A); | [A]US5237968 (MILLER CHARLES R [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0751285 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 13, lines 15--28; figure - *; | [AD]US5713316 (STURMAN ODED E [US]) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 44 - column 7, line 11; figures 6-8 *; | [AP]WO9846876 (STURMAN ODED E [US], et al) [AP] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US89980197 | US80766897 | US44266595 | US83809397 | US5255641 | US5339777 | US5638781 | US5640987 |