EP1189560 - A COCHLEAR IMPLANT ELECTRODE ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochlear Limited 14 Mars Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREABA, Claudiu-Gheorghe 4/39 Belmont Avenue Wollstonecraft, NSW 2065 / AU | 02 /
DADD, Fysh 19 Loftus Street Leichhardt, NSW 2040 / AU | 03 /
DARLY, Ian 18 Northcott Road Cromer Heights, NSW 2099 / AU | 04 /
PARKER, John 19 Moore Street Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Morgan, David James Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Morgan, David James Langner Parry, 52 - 54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99923315.8 | 21.05.1999 | [2002/13] | WO1999AU00391 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071063 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1189560 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189560 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/04, A61N1/375, A61M25/01, A61N1/05 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
A61N1/0541 (EP,US);
A61F11/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | A61F11/04, A61N1/375, A61M25/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2002/13] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENMATRIX FÜR COCHLEARIMPLANTAT | [2002/13] | English: | A COCHLEAR IMPLANT ELECTRODE ARRAY | [2002/13] | French: | RESEAU D'ELECTRODES POUR IMPLANT COCHLEAIRE | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 19.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 20.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05015285.9 / EP1604626 | EP08020628.7 / EP2042137 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4357497 (HOCHMAIR INGEBORG J, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-12 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 57 *; | [A]US5000194 (VAN DEN HONERT CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 14-16,22 * column 3, line 8 - line 27 ** figure - *; | [A]WO9730670 (MED EL ELEKTROMED GERAETE GMBH [AT]) [A] 13-31 * page 10, line 12 - line 24 *; | [X]US5800500 (SPELMAN FRANCIS A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-12 * column 3, line 17 - line 56 *; | [A]WO9911321 (ADVANCED BIONICS CORP [US]) [A] 13-31 * page 9, line 16 - page 11, line 2 * * page 13, line 18 - line 26 * * page 14, line 7 - line 15 * | International search | [X]US4686765 (BYERS CHARLES L [US], et al); | [X]WO8900870 (COCHLEAR PTY LTD [AU]); | [X]US5545219 (KUZMA JANUSZ A [US]); | [X]WO9710784 (COCHLEAR LTD [AU]) |