EP1098380 - FUEL CELL GAS SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Joji, Toyota Jidosha K. K. 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
MIZUNO, Seiji, Toyota Jidosha K. K. 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99924033.6 | 15.06.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999JP03190 | Priority number, date | JP19980189927 | 18.06.1998 Original published format: JP 18992798 | [2001/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966579 | Date: | 23.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098380 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H01M8/0206 (EP);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/0228 (EP);
H01M8/0254 (EP);
H01M2300/0082 (EP);
H01M8/0256 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | GASSEPARATOR FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN | [2001/19] | English: | FUEL CELL GAS SEPARATOR | [2001/19] | French: | SEPARATEUR DE GAZ POUR PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2000 | Translation filed | 18.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 09.08.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5893170 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [X]JPH02227964 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI); | [XP]JPH10308227 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JPH05314999 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPS5983361 (ENGELHARD CORP) |