EP1077738 - HIGH PERFORMANCE COIL WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2007/28] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings, Christ Church Barbados, West Indies / BB | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Financial Services Centre, P.O. Box 111, Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael, Barbados / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROONEY, Maura 10 Shepard Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 02 /
RICHARD, Joseph 114 Page Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 03 /
KAPRAVY, Andy 28 Prospect Street Stoughton, MA 02072 / US | 04 /
LIU, Clifford, M. 24 Alward Drive Randolph, MA 02368 / US | 05 /
CHU, Michael, S., H. 121 Browne Street Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 06 /
MIRARCHI, Tom 18 Concord Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99924237.3 | 13.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US10673 | Priority number, date | US19980078946 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: US 78946 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9958183 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077738 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1077738 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09083 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2001/09] | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGS-WICKLUNGSDRAHT | [2001/09] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE COIL WIRE | [2001/09] | French: | FILAMENT POUR ENROULEMENT HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP07005193.3 / EP1803482 | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5067489 (LIND STUART J [US]) [X] 1,7,9,11,14,18,20 * column W *; | [DA]US5238004 (SAHATJIAN RONALD [US], et al) [DA] 1-3,11 * column 4, line 5 - column 6, line 9; figure - *; | [X]US5368049 (RAMAN L VENKATA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,11,14,18 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 59; figure - *; | [X]US5664580 (ERICKSON DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,11,14,18-20 * column 4, line 46 - column 8, line 38; figure - *; | [A]US5695111 (NANIS LEONARD [US]) [A] 1,2,11,14,17 * column 6, line 45 - column 8, line 59; figure - *; | [A]EP0820782 (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,9,11,13,15 * column 9, line 42 - column 13, line 40; figure - *; | [PX]WO9839049 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,5,7,9-11,14,18-20 * page 6, line 15 - page 9, line 9; figure - *; | [PX]EP0868924 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [PX] 1,2,5,7,11,14* the whole document * | by applicant | US4925445 | US5147317 | US5230348 | US5238004 | US5739779 |