EP1086226 - CYCLIN-DEPENDENT KINASE INHIBITORS AS PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Canada as represented by the Minister of Agriculture and Agri-Food Saskatchewan Research Centre, 107 Science Place Saskatoon, SK S7N 0X2 / CA | For all designated states University of Saskatchewan Box 5000 RPO University 110 Gymnasium Place Saskatoon, SK S7N 4J8 / CA | For all designated states National Research Council of Canada 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa, ON K1A 0R6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Canada as represented by the Minister of Agriculture and Agri-Food Saskatchewan Research Centre, 107 Science Place Saskatoon, SK S7N 0X2 / CA | ||
For all designated states University of Saskatchewan Box 500 RPO University 110 Gymnasium Place Saskatoon, SK S7N 4J8 / CA | |||
For all designated states National Research Council of Canada 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa ON K1A OR6 / CA | |||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Her Majesty The Queen in Right of Canada, as represented by The Minister of Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada Saskatchewan Research Centre, 107 Science Place Sakatoon, Saskatchewan S7N OX2 / CA | ||
For all designated states University of Saskatchewan Technologies Inc. 117 Science Place Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 5C8 / CA | |||
For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa Ontario K1A OR6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hong, Agriculture and Agrifood Canada Saskatchewan Research Centre, 107 Canada Place Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 0X2 / CA | 02 /
FOWKE, Larry, C., The University of Saskatchewan Dept. of Biology, 117 Science Place Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 5C8 / CA | 03 /
CROSBY, William, L. 202 Dore Crescent Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7K 4X9 / CA | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | De Clercq, Ann G. Y., et al De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | De Clercq, Ann, et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners c.v., Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | ||
Former [2002/43] | Brants, Johan Philippe Emile, et al De Clercq, Brants & Partner cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | ||
Former [2001/13] | De Clercq, Ann De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv., Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 99924620.0 | 08.06.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999CA00532 | Priority number, date | CA19982235978 | 08.06.1998 Original published format: CA 2235978 | CA19982256121 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: CA 2256121 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9964599 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086226 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N15/82, C07K14/415, G01N33/53, A01N65/00, A01H5/00 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | CYCLINABHÄNGIGE KINASEN-INHIBITOREN ALS REGULATOREN DES PFLANZENWACHSTUMS | [2001/13] | English: | CYCLIN-DEPENDENT KINASE INHIBITORS AS PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS | [2001/13] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA KINASE DEPENDANT DE LA CYCLINE, UTILISES COMME REGULATEUR DE CROISSANCE DES PLANTES | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9726327 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10,16-30 * page 47, line 34 - page 51, line 4; claims 10,13 * [Y] 4-9,31; | [PX]WO9914331 (CROPDESIGN NV [BE], et al) [PX] 1-10,13,14,16-31* the whole document *; | [Y] - WANG, H., ET AL., "Arabidopsis thaliana cyclin-dependent kinase inhibitor protein (ICK1) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL ACCESSION NO. U94772, (19970429), XP002067455 [Y] 4-7,31 * the whole document * | [ ] - WANG, H., ET AL., "A plant cyclin-dependent kinase inhibitor gene", NATURE, (19970403), vol. 386, pages 451 - 452, XP002054969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/386451a0 | [Y] - FOUNTAIN, M.D., "Chenopodium rubrum G1 cyclin-dependent kinase inhibitor mRNA, complete cds", EMBL ACCESSION NO. AJ002173, (19971127), XP002067552 [Y] 8,9 * the whole document * | [A] - DOERNER P ET AL, "CONTROL OF ROOT GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT BY CYCLIN EXPRESSION", NATURE, (19960411), vol. 380, pages 520 - 523, XP002045509 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/380520a0 | [A] - DOONAN J, "PLANT GROWTH: ROOTS IN THE CELL CYCLE", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (19960701), vol. 6, no. 7, page 788/789, XP002045511 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00595-X |